Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Jerry Edwards, Jr
Referred: Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 3:23-cv-01177
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 25, 2024 2:27 AM CST
Defendant
Ochsner L S U Health System of North Louisiana
Represented By
Connor Harris Fields
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Jennifer Faroldi Kogos
Jones Walker (no)
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr
3856 Garrett Rd Lot 6
Monroe, LA 71202
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ochsner L S U Monroe Medical Center
Terminated: 09/29/2023
Represented By
Jennifer Faroldi Kogos
Jones Walker (no)
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
30 30 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/10 11:53 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re28 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. (aty,Carroll, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Motion Setting Tue 08/20 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:28 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Motions referred to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 08/20 4:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ochsner L S U Health System of North Louisiana.(aty,Kogos, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/07 2:42 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ochsner L S U Monroe Medical Center filed by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr.(aty,Carroll, James) Modified docket text on 8/7/2024 (Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel Tue 08/06 5:20 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting25 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel James L Carroll for Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/6/2024. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
25 25 motion Enroll as Counsel Mon 08/05 3:26 PM
MOTION for James L. Carroll to Enroll as Counsel by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/5/2024.(Attorney James L Carroll added to party Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr(pty:pla))(aty,Carroll, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Monday, July 08, 2024
24 24 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/08 1:33 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Mr. Reynolds is ORDERED to file his Amended Complaint on or before Wednesday, August 7, 2024. Signed by Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr on 7/8/2024. (crt,Roaix, G)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
23 23 order _ADI Minute Entry Reassigning Case (ADI ONLY) Mon 06/03 2:32 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr. Judge Elizabeth E Foote no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/3/2024. (crt,Kiper, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 11/14 11:37 AM
SUR-REPLY styled as Response to7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 11/14 9:33 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying8 Motion to Strike8 MOTION to Strike1 Complaint Doc. 1, PP 3-4 and Doc. 1-2, PP 9-16 MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document. The undersigned previously granted the motion to seal the sensitive records filed by Plaintiff in this matter, but deferred ruling on Defendant's Motion to Strike those records pending the filing of an opposition by Plaintiff. Plaintiff has filed an opposition, contending that the records are necessary and relevant to his case, but agreeing that they be placed under seal. Having reviewed the motion and the opposition, the undersigned hereby DENIES the motion to strike at this time. At this early stage of litigation, with a motion to dismiss pending, Plaintiff should be allowed to present his case. Further, although Defendant believes that Plaintiff may have taken the records when he was terminated, Defendant also states that Plaintiff may have obtained the records from the person to whom they belong. Thus, at this time the motion is denied, subject to Defendant's right to re-urge if evidence is available to demonstrate that the records were improperly obtained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/14/2023. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 11/14 9:01 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, and the Clerk of Court is to file the Sur-Reply in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/14/2023. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
19 19 motion Leave to File Document Mon 11/13 9:42 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2023.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed pleading
utility Motions Transferred Mon 11/13 9:46 AM
Motions Transferred regarding19 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/08 1:57 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Ochsner L S U Health System of North Louisiana. (aty,Kogos, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
17 17 respm Response to Motion Wed 11/01 9:56 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/01 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Receive Notice & Service Electronically by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/23 4:31 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's response due by 5:00 p.m. on 11/3/2023. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/23/2023. (crt,Enkey, R)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Fri 10/20 12:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/20/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Transferred Fri 10/20 2:54 PM
Motions Transferred regarding14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
13 13 respm Response to Motion Wed 10/11 7:40 AM
OPPOSITION to Motion re8 MOTION to Strike1 Complaint Doc. 1, PP 3-4 and Doc. 1-2, PP 9-16 filed by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Seal Previously Filed Document Tue 10/03 1:03 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Seal Previously Filed Document re:1 Complaint Doc. 1, PP 3-4 and Doc. 1-2, PP 9-16 MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document. FURTHER ORDERED deferring ruling on8 Motion to Strike1 Complaint until Plaintiff has an opportunity to respond. Plaintiff must file any opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike no later than 10/13/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/3/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/03 1:05 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Strike1 Complaint Doc. 1, PP 3-4 and Doc. 1-2, PP 9-16 MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document. Responses due by 10/13/2023. See12 Order. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
utility Motions Transferred Mon 10/02 9:37 AM
Motions Transferred regarding8 MOTION to Strike1 Complaint Doc. 1, PP 3-4 and Doc. 1-2, PP 9-16 MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
11 11 misc Proposed Order/Judgment Fri 09/29 2:58 PM
PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Ochsner L S U Health System of North Louisiana re8 Motion to Strike,, Motion to Seal Previously Filed Document,. (aty,Kogos, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 09/29 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Jennifer Faroldi Kogos on behalf of Ochsner L S U Health System of North Louisiana regarding8 MOTION to Strike1 Complaint Doc. 1, PP 3-4 and Doc. 1-2, PP 9-16 MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Motion Setting Fri 09/29 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Strike Seal Previously Filed Document Fri 09/29 1:09 PM
MOTION to Strike1 Complaint Doc. 1, PP 3-4 and Doc. 1-2, PP 9-16 by Ochsner L S U Monroe Medical Center. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/29/2023.(aty,Kogos, Jennifer). Added MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document on 9/29/2023 (Bunting, M). Modified to add additional relief requested and to reflect deficient status on 9/29/2023 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 9/29/2023 (Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/29 12:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Ochsner L S U Health System of North Louisiana. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky.(Attorney Jennifer Faroldi Kogos added to party Ochsner L S U Monroe Medical Center(pty:dft))(aty,Kogos, Jennifer) Modified filer on 9/29/2023 (Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/29 3:04 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Strike1 Complaint Doc. 1, PP 3-4 and Doc. 1-2, PP 9-16 MOTION to Seal Previously Filed Document. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/29/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/27 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. Ochsner L S U Monroe Medical Center served on 9/27/2023, answer due 10/18/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/08 3:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. Ochsner L S U Monroe Medical Center served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Fri 09/01 1:33 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ochsner L S U Monroe Medical Center. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/01 1:32 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 9/1/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/29 4:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/29/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/29 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Ochsner L S U Monroe Medical Center filed by Joseph Ray Reynolds, Jr.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/31 11:54 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]