Original Case: 1:20-cv-07787

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00907
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Terminated:Aug 28, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 30, 2023 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Jose Taveras, Individuallly
Defendant
Christopher Maltman, individually
Defendant - Appellant-Cross-Appellee
Equinox Holdings, Inc., DBA Equinox Fitness Club
Represented By
Greg Riolo
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jason A. Zoldessy
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellant-Cross-Appellee
Equinox East 92nd Street, Inc.
Represented By
Jason A. Zoldessy
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee-Cross-Appellant
Robynn Europe
Represented By
Stephen Bergstein
Bergstein & Ullrich, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/30/2023 4:39 AM EDT
Friday, June 16, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Equinox East 92nd Street, Inc. and Equinox Holdings, Inc., FILED. [3531808] [23-907] [Entered: 06/21/2023 10:31 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 24 pgs Case FILED
2 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/18/2023, RECEIVED.[3531819] [23-907] [Entered: 06/21/2023 10:46 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3531820] [23-907] [Entered: 06/21/2023 10:47 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 25 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Equinox East 92nd Street, Inc. and Equinox Holdings, Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-27892793, FILED.[3531824] [23-907] [Entered: 06/21/2023 10:52 AM]
Related: [-]