Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-23990
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Terminated:Sep 13, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 25, 2024 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JESSICA GUZMAN
Represented By
DANA A LIZIK
Johnson Law Group - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 31, 2023
3 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO COUNSEL - "CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 59 (Docketing Procedures for MSA Eligible Claimants and Administrative Docket Tolling Clarification) states that you must SELECT ONE OF THE FOLLOWING OFFICES ONLY: Pensacola Overflow One, Pensacola Overflow Two, or Pensacola Overflow Three. DO NOT SELECT Gainesville, Pensacola, Tallahassee, or Panama City." See ECF No. 3813 at 3-4. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LIZIK, DANA)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-8111972.), filed by JESSICA GUZMAN. (LIZIK, DANA)
Related: [-]