Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-60519

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffery W Cavender
Case #: 1:23-ap-05114
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kevin Jenkins
205 Calvery Way
McDonough, GA 30252
Represented By
Craig A. Cooper
The Semrad Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Curt Olof Lindstrom, II
The Semrad Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Vincent Paul Leibbrandt
The Semrad Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Ida Townson, United States Trustee, Region 21
Office of the Untied States Trustee Richard B Russell Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Suite 362
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
Lindsay P. S. Kolba
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, January 12, 2024
13 13 misc Returned Mail Fri 01/12 2:29 PM
Returned mail addressed to: Kevin Jenkins, 15 Albany Avenue, Brooklyn, NY 11216-2569. Defendant served at multiple addresses. Related [+] (ngs)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
misc Adversary Closed Wed 01/10 11:27 AM
Adversary 1:23-ap-5114 Closed (cws)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Default Judgment Sat 12/23 12:46 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Default Judgment Notice Date 12/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
11 11 order Default Judgment, Motion for Wed 12/20 12:30 PM
Order On Motion for Default Judgment. ORDERED that the United States Trustees Motion for Default Judgment be and is hereby GRANTED and Defendant's discharge is hereby DENIED. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 12/20/2023. (mrw)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
10 10 motion Default Judgment, Motion for Tue 11/14 10:56 AM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lindsay P. S. Kolba on behalf of Mary Ida Townson, United States Trustee, Region 21. (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SCRA Status Report
Thursday, November 02, 2023
misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 11/02 10:24 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default, pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7055 and a Request for Entry of Default filed by Mary Ida Townson, United States Trustee, Region 21. It appears from the record that Kevin Jenkins, has failed to plead or otherwise defend in this case as required by law. Related [+] (yl)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
9 9 misc Request for Entry of Default Wed 11/01 10:07 AM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Lindsay P. S. Kolba on behalf of Mary Ida Townson, United States Trustee, Region 21. (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
8 8 misc 0-Certificate of Service Tue 10/17 4:15 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service of Complaint, Summons, and Stipulation Extending Time Filed by Lindsay P. S. Kolba on behalf of Mary Ida Townson, United States Trustee, Region 21. Related [+] (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-] 1 ,2 ,4
Friday, October 13, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (489) Sat 10/14 12:50 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Notice Date 10/13/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
6 6 order Withdraw as Attorney, Motion to Wed 10/11 10:03 AM
Order GRANTING Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 10/11/2023. (jlc)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
5 5 motion Withdraw as Attorney, Motion to Wed 09/20 10:44 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Vincent Paul Leibbrandt on behalf of Kevin Jenkins. (Leibbrandt, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 09/13 3:09 PM
Stipulation Extending Time Filed by Vincent Paul Leibbrandt on behalf of Kevin Jenkins. (Leibbrandt, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Wed 08/30 12:22 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Lindsay P. S. Kolba on behalf of Mary Ida Townson, United States Trustee, Region 21. Related [+] (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Wed 08/30 10:36 AM
Summons Issued on Kevin Jenkins Answer Due 09/29/2023 (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/29 3:31 PM
Adversary case 23-05114 Complaint against Kevin Jenkins Objecting to Discharge , 41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)) Filed by Mary Ida Townson, United States Trustee, Region 21 (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-]