Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:23-cv-03385
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2023
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 26, 2024 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC
1500 Walnut Street, Suite 1900
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
JUSTINE SEDA
107 Olive Street,
West Reading, PA 19611
Represented By
SAMUEL A. DION
Dion And Goldberger
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 06/26 10:30 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. ON JUNE 26, 2024. 6/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dja)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs misc Letter Wed 06/26 9:48 AM
Letter dated 06/26/2024 by JUSTINE SEDA. (DION, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
16 16 1 pgs misc Status Report Fri 05/31 3:47 PM
STATUS REPORT by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. (Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
15 15 misc Status Report Wed 05/01 9:16 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. (Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 04/01 4:03 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
13 13 misc Status Report Fri 03/01 10:33 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
12 12 misc Status Report Thu 02/01 4:14 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
11 11 1 pgs misc Status Report Fri 12/29 8:32 AM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
10 10 1 pgs misc Status Report Thu 11/30 11:11 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
9 9 1 pgs misc Status Report Wed 11/01 9:22 AM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
8 8 1 pgs discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 10/06 3:25 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC.(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/04 2:48 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT HAS NOT FILED THE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 AT THE TIME OF FILING ITS FIRST APPEARANCE, DEFENDANT IS HEREBY ORDERED TO FILE ITS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT2 WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/4/23. 10/4/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Stipulation and Order Tue 10/03 3:27 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING ARBITRATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/3/23. 10/3/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
5 5 2 pgs misc Stipulation Thu 09/28 12:56 PM
STIPULATION and Order to Stay Case Pending Arbitration (Joint) by MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/11 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUSTINE SEDA re: Jeff Brown served Summons and Complaint upon MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC by Hand delivery. MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC served on 9/11/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (DION, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/31 8:54 AM
INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/31/23. 8/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/30 5:00 PM
Summons Issued as to MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/30/23 (er)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 08/30 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT against MORAVIA HEALTH NETWORK, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16913041.), filed by JUSTINE SEDA.(DION, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form