Marmer et al v. Firmage et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Jill N Parrish |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00580 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 12:0022 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 26, 2024 1:38 AM MST |
Defendant
ManyOne World, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kenneth E Wilber
|
|
Defendant
Science Invents LLC
|
|
Defendant
Academy of Sciences and Arts, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Robert A Richards
|
|
Defendant
Paula Collins
|
|
Defendant
David Hestenes
|
|
Defendant
InterNASA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
River Judd
|
|
Defendant
Motion Physics LLC
|
|
Defendant
Michael May
|
|
Defendant
Manyone LLC
|
|
Defendant
Virginia Menlove
|
|
Defendant
Integral Initiatives LLC
|
|
Defendant
Joseph P. Firmage
|
|
Defendant
Jairo Toro
|
|
Defendant
Colin Bigelow
|
|
Defendant
21C Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Ronca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Reiss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Pole
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Multidimensional Capital
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Max Marmer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Dawejko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Bozarth
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Gillian Pothier
Terminated: 09/05/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Marmer
Terminated: 09/05/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peggeth Loeb
Terminated: 09/05/2023
|
Represented By
|
1. | Utah entrepreneur facing federal lawsuit is charged with financially exploiting 80-year-old woman (ksl.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/05/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice From the Court
Fri 04/26 10:22 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: On April 19, 2024, the parties filed their55 Stipulation of Dismissal of Paulette Collins. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the stipulated dismissal is self-effectuating. Defendant Paulette Collins is dismissed without prejudice and each party will bear its own fees and costs. No order will follow. (tb) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/19 6:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Paulette Collins by Brandon Bozarth, Stanley Dawejko, Max Marmer, Multidimensional Capital, Michael Pole, Joseph Reiss, Jonathan Ronca. (Deiss, Andrew) |