California Southern District Court
Judge:M James Lorenz
Referred: Benjamin J Cheeks
Case #: 3:23-cv-01595
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02023-00032117-CU-BC-CTL
Last checked: Monday Feb 26, 2024 12:17 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Bushnell Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
William S. Weltman
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Karlin E. Sangdahl
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Carla M. Wirtschafter
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Vista Outdoors Inc.
Represented By
William S. Weltman
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Karlin E. Sangdahl
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Carla M. Wirtschafter
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
IGolf, Inc.
Represented By
Justin F. Spearman
Bordin Semmer LLP
contact info
Joshua Bordin-Wosk
Bordin Semmer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bushnell Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
William S. Weltman
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Karlin E. Sangdahl
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Carla M. Wirtschafter
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-25
Defendant
Vista Outdoors Inc.
Represented By
William S. Weltman
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Karlin E. Sangdahl
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Carla M. Wirtschafter
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
IGolf, Inc.
Represented By
Justin F. Spearman
Bordin Semmer LLP
contact info
Joshua Bordin-Wosk
Bordin Semmer LLP
contact info
Andrei V. Serpik
Bordin Semmer LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
58 58 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 03/12 3:01 PM
ORDER Granting57 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Amended Scheduling Order. Mandatory Settlement Conference reset for 10/20/2025 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge D. Thomas Ferraro. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/2/2026. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/9/2026 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5B before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Magistrate Judge D. Thomas Ferraro on 3/12/2025. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
57 57 motion Amend/Correct Mon 03/10 4:24 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by IGolf, Inc..(Bordin-Wosk, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration JBW Declaration