New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:23-cv-06480
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Case in other court:New York Southern, 1:23-cv-06424
Last checked: Sunday Feb 25, 2024 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
Len Stoler, Inc.
Represented By
Stacey Lynn Pitcher
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant
Silver Star Motors LLC
Silver Star Motors LLC 3411 Northern Boulevard
Long Island City, NY 11101
Represented By
Stacey Lynn Pitcher
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant
Stoler of Queens, Inc.
Represented By
Stacey Lynn Pitcher
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Chait
Represented By
Brian Adam Heller
Schwartz Perry & Heller, LLP
contact info
Davida S. Perry
Schwartz Perry & Heller LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/17 9:59 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jacqueline Chait (Perry, Davida)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/17 11:18 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (AG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 02/25 12:33 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to File by Jacqueline Chait -- Plaintiff's request29 for an extension of time is granted. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal by March 27, 2025. The parties are reminded that extension requests must comply with Rule I.F. of this Court's Individual Practice Rules, including the requirement that extensions of time must be made at least two business days prior to the scheduled deadline and must include the all parties' positions on the request. Failure to comply with this rule without showing good cause may result in denial of such requests in the future. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 2/25/2025. (AG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
29 29 misc Letter Mon 02/24 10:15 AM
Letter seeking extension of time to file Stipulation of Dismissal by Jacqueline Chait (Perry, Davida)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Phone/Email Tue 02/11 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Pitcher, Stacey)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Tue 02/11 3:10 PM
ORDER -- The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal by February 25, 2025. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 2/11/2025. (AG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
27 27 misc Letter Wed 12/04 11:40 AM
Letter re time to restore by Jacqueline Chait (Perry, Davida)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Tue 12/03 4:24 PM
REPORT of Mediation Settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 12/17/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
adr Selection of Mediator Thu 10/03 12:29 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Barry Peek selected as Mediator. Date Time and Location in-person/remote: December 3, 2024. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation. For more details on the submission, please consult Local Civil Rule 83.8(b)(4). Attendance is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Mediators contact information can be found on the docket sheet. Within fourteen days of the conclusion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report. (JR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 10/02 10:33 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time from November 18, 2024 to December 17, 2024 to Complete Mediation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/2/2024. (JM) Modified on 10/2/2024 (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
26 26 misc Status Report Tue 10/01 4:33 PM
STATUS REPORT regarding Mediation by Stoler of Queens, Inc. (Pitcher, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 09/17 12:59 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 11/18/24. Selection of Mediator due by 10/1/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/17/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Tue 09/17 3:58 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. Counsel are to select a mediator, contact the mediator to schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place (in-person or remote) of the first mediation session using the Selection of the Mediator Form on the ADR Forms website under Mediator Forms/For Counsel and Parties: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms or via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators, their qualifications and contact information, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1). The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (JR)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
25 25 misc Letter Mon 09/16 4:08 PM
Letter by Jacqueline Chait (Perry, Davida)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
minutes Discovery Hearing Mon 09/09 5:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Counsel present by phone. Argument heard on24 Motion to compel. Motion granted for the reasons explained at the conference. The deposition of the therapist shall take place on a date and at a time mutually convenient for counsel and the witness. Mediation discussed. Counsel shall advise by 9/23/24 whether they wish a referral to the EDNY Mediation program. If so, the therapist's deposition, which is limited to 3 hours, shall not be scheduled until after the mediation is completed.. Discovery Hearing held on 9/9/2024 (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 09/09 5:26 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Compel. See 9/9/24 minute entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/9/2024. (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Thu 08/08 9:45 AM
Letter re status report by Jacqueline Chait (Perry, Davida)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
order Scheduling Order Tue 07/30 3:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The telephone conference set for 8/1/24 is adjourned to 9/9/24 at 4:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Parties are directed to dial 571-353-2301, and use Guest ID #: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/30/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Tue 07/30 3:31 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 8/8/2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/30/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
order Order(Other) Mon 06/17 1:21 PM
ORDER: The parties are advised that the dial-in and access code for the next telephone conference and any future telephone conferences scheduled before the Hon. Robert M. Levy, USMJ has changed to the following: Dial-In: 571-353-2301, Guest ID #: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/17/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 03/26 9:48 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Stoler of Queens, Inc.. (Pitcher, Stacey)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 03/26 10:45 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The telephone conference scheduled for 3/27/24 is adjourned to 8/1/24 at 11:00am (same dial-in and access code). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/26/2024. (AM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/16 12:59 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle. Judge Eric R. Komitee no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (BBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Wed 11/29 10:17 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Davida Perry, Stacey Pitcher present by telephone. Case management order approved. Initial disclosures to be completed by 12/15/23. Fact discovery deadline 5/29/24. Expert discovery deadline 7/31/24. Next conference 3/27/24 at 10:00am. Dial-in: 888-684-8852, access code: 6223489. Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/29/2023 (AM)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
22 22 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 11/27 1:00 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Jacqueline Chait (Perry, Davida)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/19 12:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for November 29, 2023 at 10:00 a.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. All counsel must be available. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with defendants counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/19/2023. (JM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IC QUESTIONNAIRE,
Att: 2 INDIVIDUAL RULES
Thursday, October 12, 2023
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/12 3:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stoler of Queens, Inc. (Pitcher, Stacey)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 10/12 3:43 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by Stoler of Queens, Inc.. (Pitcher, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/06 11:11 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stoler of Queens, Inc. answer due 10/13/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/6/2023. (AM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
18 18 misc Letter Thu 10/05 5:10 PM
Letter Motion for Extension of Time by Stoler of Queens, Inc. (Pitcher, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/27 11:36 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re16 Amended Complaint by Stoler of Queens, Inc.. (Pitcher, Stacey)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/27 12:40 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Stoler of Queens, Inc. answer due 10/05/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/27/2023. (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/14 9:38 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stoler of Queens, Inc., filed by Jacqueline Chait. (Perry, Davida)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
15 15 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 08/30 12:38 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
Related: [-]
14 14 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (DEACTIVATED EVENT - DO NOT USE) Wed 08/30 12:37 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-06424. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Transfer Wed 08/30 12:39 PM
The case of Chait v. Stoler of Queens, Inc. et al , has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 23-cv-6480 . PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(tg) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
13 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:12 Letter filed by Jacqueline Chait. ENDORSEMENT: It is hereby ordered that the case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York pursuant to SDNY Local Rule 83.1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/22/2023) (tg) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
12 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Davida S. Perry dated August 22, 2023 re: venue. Document filed by Jacqueline Chait..(Perry, Davida) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
11 11 ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to Friday, September 15, 2023. Separately, a civil action may be brought in "a judicial district in which any defendant resides," or where "a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred. 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b); see also 42 U.S.C. § 2000e-5(f)(3). Plaintiff alleges that she was employed in Queens by Defendants based in Queens. See Compl., Dkt. 1, paragraph 4-10. Venue therefore appears improper in the Southern District of New York based on the face of the Complaint. Not later than Friday, August 25, 2023, Plaintiff must show cause why venue is proper in the Southern District of New York or consent to the case's transfer to the Eastern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/18/2023) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Stacey L. Pitcher dated August 18, 2023. Document filed by Len Stoler, Inc., Silver Star Motors, LLC, Stoler of Queens, Inc...(Pitcher, Stacey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stacey Lynn Pitcher on behalf of Len Stoler, Inc., Silver Star Motors, LLC, Stoler of Queens, Inc...(Pitcher, Stacey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines: Len Stoler, Inc. answer due 9/15/2023; Silver Star Motors, LLC answer due 9/15/2023; Stoler of Queens, Inc. answer due 9/15/2023. (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
8 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Len Stoler, Inc. served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. Service was accepted by Jane Doe. Document filed by Jacqueline Chait..(Perry, Davida) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
7 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Stoler of Queens, Inc. served on 7/28/2023, answer due 8/18/2023. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by Jacqueline Chait..(Perry, Davida) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
6 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Silver Star Motors, LLC served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. Service was accepted by Teresa Grandison. Document filed by Jacqueline Chait..(Perry, Davida) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
5 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Len Stoler, Inc., Silver Star Motors, LLC, Stoler of Queens, Inc.. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
4 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stoler of Queens, Inc., Len Stoler, Inc., Silver Star Motors, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jacqueline Chait..(Perry, Davida) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Davida S. Perry. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:451; Jury Demand code n (None);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000; the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff);. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
3 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Adam Heller on behalf of Jacqueline Chait..(Heller, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perry, Davida) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Len Stoler, Inc., Silver Star Motors, LLC, Stoler of Queens, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28051107)Document filed by Jacqueline Chait..(Perry, Davida) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/30/2023.]
Related: [-]