Colorado District Court
Judge:Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:23-cv-02226
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 25, 2024 1:26 AM MST
Defendant
New Vision Hotels Two, LLC
Represented By
Ryan Paul Lessmann
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Martel Sharod Brown
Represented By
Michael Gregory Bohan
Bohan Law LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
New Vision Hospitality Two
Terminated: 12/22/2023
Defendant
Adam Pietraszek
Terminated: 12/22/2023


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
115 115 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Wed 04/30 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Motion to Submit Previously Provided Video Evidence, ECF No.110 , which was filed by the plaintiff on April 23, 2025. Given that the plaintiff filed an amended Motion to Submit Previously Provided Video Evidence, ECF No.114 , on April 29, 2025, which requests the same relief, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Submit Previously Provided Video Evidence, ECF No.110 , is DENIED as moot. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/30/2025.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
114 114 motion Leave Wed 04/30 8:35 AM
Amended Motion To Submit Previously Provided Video Evidence by Plaintiff Martel Sharod Brown. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
113 113 motion Leave Wed 04/30 8:33 AM
Motion To Accept Future Medical Documentation Once Available by Plaintiff Martel Sharod Brown. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
112 112 motion Disqualify Counsel Wed 04/30 8:31 AM
Motion To Remove Defendant's Counsel For Violation Of Plaintiff's Rights by Plaintiff Martel Sharod Brown. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
111 111 3 pgs motion Order Wed 04/30 8:29 AM
Plaintiff's Motion To Submit Supplemental Evidence In Opposition To Defendant's74 Motion For Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Martel Sharod Brown.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
110 110 motion Leave Wed 04/23 12:00 PM
Motion To Submit Previously Provided Video Evidence by Plaintiff Martel Sharod Brown. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]