Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00175
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 31, 2023 2:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Dominic Johnson-Cree (1)
Represented By
Travis Poindexter
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Kcmo Walnut Street
contact info
FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Bruce A. Rhoades
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/31/2023 2:58 AM CDT
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
ORDER as to Dominic Johnson-Cree. This indictment shall be kept secret until a defendant is in custody or has been given bail, and upon completion of the issuance of the warrant of arrest, the Clerk shall seal the indictment, and it shall remain sealed pending further order of the Court. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. (Kern, Kendra)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Dominic Johnson-Cree (1) count(s) 1. (Kern, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts as to Dominic Johnson-Cree. Signed on 8/1/2023 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs.(Kern, Kendra)
Related: [-]