New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:23-cv-13643
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2024 4:13 AM EST
Defendant
KUBILAY HAN BASCAVUS
Represented By
RUDY A. DERMESROPIAN
Rudy A. Dermesropian, LLC
contact info
Defendant
IHSAN ORUC
Represented By
RUDY A. DERMESROPIAN
Rudy A. Dermesropian, LLC
contact info
Defendant
ONUR OZBINAR
Represented By
RUDY A. DERMESROPIAN
Rudy A. Dermesropian, LLC
contact info
Defendant
PHONE LCD PARTS LLC
Represented By
RUDY A. DERMESROPIAN
Rudy A. Dermesropian, LLC
contact info
Defendant
ONDER SAYAR
Represented By
RUDY A. DERMESROPIAN
Rudy A. Dermesropian, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FARUK BILIR
Represented By
CLIFFORD TUCKER
Sacco & Fillas, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ILHAN GOKSU
Represented By
CLIFFORD TUCKER
Sacco & Fillas, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OZKAN KARAVELIOGLU
Represented By
CLIFFORD TUCKER
Sacco & Fillas, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
44 44 misc Letter Mon 05/05 5:10 PM
Letter from Clifford Tucker. (TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
43 43 2 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Staying Case Mon 03/17 2:40 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION, that Ms. DESHA L. JACKSON, Esq. will serve as the mediator. Proceedings in this action are stayed for a period of ninety (90) days from the entry of this Order. The pending26 Motion for Class Certification is administratively terminated. On or before 3/24/2025, counsel for the parties shall contact Ms. Jackson to arrange the logistics and date for the mediation. On or before 6/17/2025, if the matter is not dismissed as settled by then, the parties shall file a joint letter informing the Undersigned of the status of the mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/17/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
42 42 misc Letter Thu 03/13 8:08 PM
Letter from Rudy A. Dermesropian re 41 Order, 40 Order,,,. (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
41 41 order Order Mon 03/10 8:21 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties failed to comply with this Court's Order 40 . On or before March 13, 2025, the parties shall file a joint status report, indicating their progress in selecting a mediator. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/26. (tad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
40 40 order Order Tue 02/25 10:54 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' February 24, 2025 letter39 in which they indicate they have agreed to mediation under Local Civil Rule 301.1 before one of three potential mediators, subject to availability: Desha L. Jackson, Esq.; Susan L. Nardone, Esq.; and Regina Wayne Joseph, Esq. The parties shall contact the potential mediators regarding availability and inform the Court no later than March 7, 2025 who will mediate this action. The parties should be mindful that the Court intends to stay proceedings in this matter for a period of 90 days during which the mediation shall take place. Therefore, in choosing a mediator, they should be sure to choose someone with availability suitable to this time frame. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/25/25. (tad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
39 39 misc Letter Mon 02/24 5:17 PM
Letter from Clifford Tucker re 38 Order,,. (TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
38 38 order Order Mon 02/10 12:24 PM
TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the February 10, 2025 conference, it is the Court's intention to refer this matter to mediation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 301.1, and stay the proceedings (including the discovery deadlines) for ninety days. The parties may also elect to proceed with a mediator who is not part of the Local Civil Rule 301.1 program. On or before February 24, 2025, the parties will inform the Court of whether they have reached agreement on the selection of a mediator, whether the mediator is part of the Local Civil Rule 301.1 program, and the identity of the mediator. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/10/2025. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 02/19 2:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 2/10/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 02/24 12:07 PM
Please be advised that this entry is for statistical purposes only regarding the Court's Text Order (ECF No. 38) entered on 2/10/2025. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
37 37 order Order Mon 02/03 9:27 AM
TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone conference on February 10, 2025, at 12:00 p.m. to discuss the parties' January 31, 2025 letter [D.E. 36]. Counsel will dial 855-244-8681 and enter 2302-026-0103# to join the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/3/2025. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
36 36 misc Letter Fri 01/31 9:31 AM
Letter from Rudy A. Dermesropian re 35 Order,. (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
35 35 order Order Tue 01/28 8:33 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties were to provide an update regarding the scheduling of a settlement conference by January 24, 2025 but have failed to do so. Accordingly, they shall file that update by or before January 31, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/28/25. (tad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/21 10:32 AM
LETTER ORDER granting33 Plaintiffs' Request for an extension, until 1/24/2025, to provide a further status update regarding the scheduling of a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/21/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
33 33 misc Letter Fri 01/17 7:34 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs' counsel, Clifford Tucker. (TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/17 4:50 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by FARUK BILIR, OZKAN KARAVELIOGLU, ILHAN GOKSU, Hamza Guven re26 MOTION to Certify Class MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION(TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, January 10, 2025
31 31 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/10 4:03 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by PHONE LCD PARTS LLC, ONDER SAYAR, ONUR OZBINAR, IHSAN ORUC, KUBILAY HAN BASCAVUS re26 MOTION to Certify Class and Plaintiffs' request for Court approval to circulate a notice of lawsuit(DERMESROPIAN, RUDY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Rudy A. Dermesropian,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of Onder Sayar
Friday, January 03, 2025
30 30 order Order Fri 01/03 11:50 AM
TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the January 3, 2025 telephone status conference, the parties will meet and confer concerning the parameters of any settlement negotiation (eg, settlement involving solely the named plaintiffs, or based on a collective, or class-based), the scope of any necessary settlement-targeted discovery and the particular information to be exchanged, the timeframe to complete the settlement-targeted discovery, and a proposed timeframe for the settlement conference with the Undersigned. On or by January 17, 2025, the parties will submit a joint status report concerning the substance of their agreement for the settlement negotiations, and a proposed timeframe for the settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/3/2025. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 01/07 1:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 1/3/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
29 29 order Text Order Tue 12/31 2:25 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties will dial 1-855-244-8681 and access code 2302-026-0103 to join the Telephone Status Conference on 1/3/2025 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/31/2024. (NEW DIAL-IN NUMBER) (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 12/12 9:25 AM
ORDER: The Court has considered Defendant's December 12, 2024 letter request to extend the briefing deadlines for the motion for conditional certification of a collective action, and to extend discovery. The request to extend the briefing deadlines is granted in part. Defendant shall file any opposition by January 10, 2024. Plaintiff must file any reply by January 17, 2025. The request to extend discovery until sixty days following the Court's decision on the motion for conditional certification is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/12/2024. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
27 27 1 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 12/11 6:55 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to26 MOTION to Certify Class , Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by PHONE LCD PARTS LLC, ONDER SAYAR, ONUR OZBINAR, IHSAN ORUC, KUBILAY HAN BASCAVUS. (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
26 26 2 pgs motion Certify Class Mon 12/02 12:26 PM
MOTION to Certify Class by FARUK BILIR, OZKAN KARAVELIOGLU, ILHAN GOKSU, Hamza Guven. Responses due by 12/16/2024.(TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Conditional Certification and Court Authorized Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b), N.J. STAT. ANN. § 34:11-56a25 and Expedited Discovery,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Faruk Bilir Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Ozkan Karavelioglu Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Ilhan Goksu Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Hamza Guven Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Payment Slip,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Screencapture PhoneLCD,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Proposed Court Authorized Notice,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Text Message,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Email Notice,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Remainder Notices
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/02 2:19 PM
Set Deadlines as to26 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion set for 1/6/2025 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/18 8:59 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/18/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
24 24 misc Proposed Order Thu 10/17 4:44 PM
Proposed Order Scheduling order by FARUK BILIR, ILHAN GOKSU, Hamza Guven, OZKAN KARAVELIOGLU. (TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 09/23 9:11 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: The parties' joint request to extend the deadline to complete discovery is granted for good cause shown in Mr. Tucker's September 20, 2024 letter [D.E. 22]. The parties shall jointly submit a proposed Amended Scheduling Order that includes a proposed deadline for each and every remaining task in this litigation, including the completion of written discovery, the completion of fact-witness depositions, the service of expert reports, and the completion of expert depositions. Counsel shall submit the jointly proposed Amended Scheduling Order by September 30, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/23/2024. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/20 7:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by FARUK BILIR, ILHAN GOKSU, Hamza Guven, OZKAN KARAVELIOGLU.(TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Consent of Hamza Guven
Thursday, September 05, 2024
21 21 order Order Thu 09/05 7:47 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the Court's August 19, 2024 Order, D.E. 20 , today's conference is adjourned without a new date. By or before September 20, 2024, Plaintiff shall either refile the notice of voluntary dismissal in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), or the parties shall submit a joint letter regarding the status of discovery. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/5/24. (tad)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
20 20 order Text Order Mon 08/19 5:41 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff Hamza Guven's notice of voluntary dismissal filed on August 16, 2024. (D.E. No. 19). Given that an answer has been filed in this matter (D.E. No. 6), Plaintiff is directed to refile the notice of voluntary dismissal in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 8/19/2024. (ps)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Fri 08/16 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Plaintiff HAMZA GUVEN by Hamza Guven (TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/09 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD TUCKER on behalf of Hamza Guven (TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Declaration Tue 07/09 4:52 PM
DECLARATION re: consent to become party plaintiff on behalf of Hamza Guven by Hamza Guven. (TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/30 4:13 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/30/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 05/31 10:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 5/30/2024. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
15 15 order Order Thu 05/02 10:41 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' April 30, 2024 letter seeking a case management conference. D.E.14 . The Court notes that there is a conference scheduled for May 30, 2024 and the Court's schedule does not permit a conference any sooner than that date. Accordingly, the May 30, 2024 conference call will proceed as scheduled at 2:30 p.m. Counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the call. Note: This dial-in information supersedes the dial-in information previously entered on the docket. The parties shall be prepared to discuss at the May 30th conference any necessary extensions to the schedule in this matter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/2/24. (tad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Tue 04/30 10:57 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs' counsel. (TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
13 13 order Order Wed 03/06 2:47 PM
TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone conference on May 30, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel shall dial 1-973-437-5535 and enter conference code 907402107# to join the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/6/24. (tad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
12 12 order Order Tue 02/27 11:24 AM
TEXT ORDER: At the request of defense counsel, the telephone status conference scheduled for March 4, 2024 is adjourned to March 6, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter access code 1456817# to join the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/27/24. (tad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Mon 02/26 7:56 PM
Letter from Rudy A. Dermesropian. (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 12/14 12:31 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/30 1:38 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/30/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 11/30 4:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2023. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
9 9 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 11/28 5:03 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by FARUK BILIR, ILHAN GOKSU, OZKAN KARAVELIOGLU.(TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
8 8 order Order Wed 11/22 3:56 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 11/28/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/22/2023. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
7 7 order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 10/24 4:12 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2023 at 12:00 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 11/28/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/24/2023. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
qc QC - Naming Attachments Fri 09/29 11:58 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, the Clerk's Office has modified the document attachment descriptions with respect to the3 Summonses Returned Executed submitted by Tucker Clifford on 9/27/2023 in order to identify the parties that were served. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/27 7:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by KUBILAY HAN BASCAVUS, IHSAN ORUC, ONUR OZBINAR, PHONE LCD PARTS LLC, ONDER SAYAR.(DERMESROPIAN, RUDY)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 09/27 7:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KUBILAY HAN BASCAVUS, IHSAN ORUC, ONUR OZBINAR, PHONE LCD PARTS LLC, ONDER SAYAR. (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/27 7:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RUDY A. DERMESROPIAN on behalf of KUBILAY HAN BASCAVUS, IHSAN ORUC, ONUR OZBINAR, PHONE LCD PARTS LLC, ONDER SAYAR (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/27 10:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ILHAN GOKSU, OZKAN KARAVELIOGLU, FARUK BILIR. All Defendants.(TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit ONDER SAYAR,
Att: 2 Affidavit ONDER SAYAR, SHAREHOLDER,
Att: 3 Affidavit ONDER SAYAR, SHAREHOLDER,
Att: 4 Affidavit ONDER SAYAR, SHAREHOLDER
Friday, September 01, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/01 11:50 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to KUBILAY HAN BASCAVUS, IHSAN ORUC, ONUR OZBINAR, PHONE LCD PARTS LLC, ONDER SAYAR. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/31 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Kubilay Han Bascavus, Ihsan Oruc, Onur Ozbinar, Phone LCD Parts LLC, Onder Sayar ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14619288) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Ilhan Goksu, Ozkan Karavelioglu, Faruk Bilir.(TUCKER, CLIFFORD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons and Rider
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/01 11:06 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
Related: [-]