Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:23-cv-01166
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2023
Re-opened:May 20, 2024
Terminated:May 21, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2024 4:22 AM EST
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
John Willard Montgomery, Jr.
Traylor Montgomery & Elliott PC
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Defendant
Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri (d/b/a MOHELA)
Represented By
Matthew Dennis Guletz
Thompson Coburn Llp (mo-Na)
contact info
Noah Patrick Sullivan
Gentry Locke
contact info
Defendant
Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, Inc. (d/b/a FedLoan Servicing)
Represented By
Steven Joseph Brotman
Locke Lord Llp (fl-Na)
contact info
Mary Stephanie Wickouski
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Francis Pellegrino
Represented By
Courtney Weiner
Law Office Of Courtney Weiner PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
TransUnion LLC
Terminated: 11/07/2023
Represented By
Marc Kirkland
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
69 69 order So Ordered Tue 05/21 11:33 AM
So Ordered in re68 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Francis Pellegrino. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/21/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
68 68 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/21 7:00 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Francis Pellegrino. (Weiner, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
67 67 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/20 4:49 PM
SO ORDERED re66 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Francis Pellegrino. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/20/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
66 66 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/17 11:31 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Francis Pellegrino. (Weiner, Courtney)
Related: [-]