Texas Western District Court
Judge:Orlando L Garcia
Case #: 5:23-cv-01099
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2023
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2024 4:33 AM CST
Defendant
Andrew Johnson
Represented By
Lawrence D. Smith
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC
contact info
Elbert Ortiz
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC
Represented By
Lawrence D. Smith
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC
contact info
Elbert Ortiz
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacob Holland
Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated 101 N. Shoreline Blvd. Suite 610
Corpus Christi, TX 78401
Represented By
Austin W. Anderson
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Lauren E. Braddy
contact info
William Clifton Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Carter T. Hastings
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Alan Clifton Gordon
contact info
Plaintiff
Riley Horton
Represented By
Austin W. Anderson
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Lauren E. Braddy
contact info
William Clifton Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Carter T. Hastings
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Alan Clifton Gordon
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 05/08 11:18 AM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL PAPERS-It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment and any appropriate supporting documents on or before Friday, June 6, 2025. All pretrial deadlines in this case are hereby STAYED pending the submission of the parties stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment and any appropriate supporting documents. The pretrial conference and trial settings are CANCELED. The Court hereby administratively CLOSES this case pending the filing of dismissal papers. If the parties wish to reopen this case, they may do so by filing a motion to that effect.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 05/07 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jacob Holland (Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 01/22 11:24 AM
ORDER GRANTING36 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; GRANTING36 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines( Motions due by 3/19/2025, Discovery due by 2/28/2025,) Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (vl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
37 37 misc Proposed Order Fri 01/17 1:58 PM
Proposed Order to36 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Second MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC, Andrew Johnson, Jacob Holland. (Ortiz, Elbert)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 01/17 1:51 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Second MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC, Andrew Johnson, Jacob Holland. (Ortiz, Elbert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/02 10:29 AM
ORDER GRANTING re34 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC, Andrew Johnson, ( Discovery due by 1/29/2024,, Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2025,). Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
34 34 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/26 4:33 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC, Andrew Johnson.(Ortiz, Elbert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 26, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Filing Fri 07/26 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Jacob Holland(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Joshua Ramirez Consent to Join
Thursday, April 11, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/11 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Filing (Corrected) Consent to Join by Jacob Holland(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of David Garrett
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Filing Tue 04/09 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Jacob Holland(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of David Garrett
Thursday, April 04, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/04 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Jacob Holland(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Jason Cuellar
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/13 12:09 PM
ORDER--Before the Court is the Parties Agreed Stipulation Regarding Notice to the Putative Collective Members (Agreed Stipulation). The Court, having considered the Agreed Stipulation, finds that the Agreed Stipulation is well taken and that it should be ACCEPTED. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
28 28 misc Stipulation Tue 03/12 10:11 AM
STIPULATION Regarding Notice to the Putative Class Action Members by Jacob Holland, Riley Horton.(Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Notice and Consent,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 07, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation Thu 03/07 12:12 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Communication with Putative Collective/Class Members by Jacob Holland. (Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 02/28 3:28 PM
ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint by Andrew Johnson, Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC.(Ortiz, Elbert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
25 25 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 02/22 3:12 PM
ORDER DENYING19 Motion to Compel as to the overtime claims and HELD IN ABEYANCE as to the retaliation claim. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
24 24 adr ADR Report - Other Tue 02/20 3:17 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Jacob Holland, Riley Horton(Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/15 9:30 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Johnson, Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC amending12 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint., filed by Riley Horton, Jacob Holland.(mgr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 02/14 4:03 PM
Text Order GRANTING22 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file Second Amended Complaint [22-1]. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Tue 02/13 5:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Jacob Holland, Riley Horton.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
21 21 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 02/13 4:27 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Andrew Johnson, Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC, re19 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Riley Horton filed by Defendant Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC, Defendant Andrew Johnson (Ortiz, Elbert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
20 20 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/06 7:37 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jacob Holland, Riley Horton, re19 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Riley Horton filed by Defendant Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC, Defendant Andrew Johnson (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
19 19 motion Compel Tue 01/23 3:40 PM
Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Riley Horton by Andrew Johnson, Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC.(Smith, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, January 08, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/08 2:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 2/20/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 3/7/2024,. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
17 17 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/05 5:03 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Jacob Holland, Riley Horton. (Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/05 11:00 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Johnson, Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC. (Smith, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 01/05 10:19 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Jacob Holland, Riley Horton. (Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
14 14 4 pgs order Order Thu 12/07 11:31 AM
ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) and Local Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 12/05 11:24 AM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Andrew Johnson, Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC.(Smith, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/21 3:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Johnson, Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC amending, filed by Riley Horton, Jacob Holland.(Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 11/21 3:14 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC. (Smith, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/13 1:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Lawrence D. Smith added to party Andrew Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence D. Smith added to party Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC(pty:dft) by Andrew Johnson, Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC.(Smith, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/10 5:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Holland. Andrew Johnson served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/07 3:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Holland. All Defendants. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Wed 11/01 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to join by Jacob Holland(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Dalton Stuart
Thursday, October 12, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Mon 10/16 10:29 AM
ORDER ALLOWING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (kg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
5 5 motion Substitute Wed 10/11 2:44 PM
MOTION to Substitute Service of Process by Jacob Holland.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Due Diligence,
Att: 2 Exhibit Tax Franchise Tax PIR,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Tue 09/12 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Jacob Holland(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Riley Horton Consent
Friday, September 01, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/01 7:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Andrew Johnson, Prime Seamless Gutters and Roofing, LLC. (nm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/31 2:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jacob Holland. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/31 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17834242), filed by Jacob Holland.(Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Jacob Holland,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/01 7:20 AM
Case assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Fri 09/01 7:21 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (nm)
Related: [-]