Banneker Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Rhode Island Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Diane Finkle |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-10570 |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Plan Confirmed: | Feb 22, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Banneker Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
25 John A Cummings Way, Suite 2
Woonsocket, RI 02895 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Gary L. Donahue
Office of the U.S. Trustee U.S. Courthouse One Exchange Terrace Suite 431
Providence, RI 02903 |
Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 12:01 PM EDT |
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 06/21 1:36 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Ricciarelli, Pamela) |