New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Case #: 1:23-cv-07772
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2023
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2024 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
Timothy M. Presutti
Represented By
Stephen Gregory Topetzes
K&l Gates (dc)
contact info
Theodore Kornobis
K&l Gates (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Wilbur Ed. Bosarge, Jr.
Nominal Defendant
NextNav, Inc.
Represented By
Maya Jumper
Freedman Normand Friedland LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis J. Donoghue
Represented By
Miriam Deborah Tauber
Miriam Tauber Law
contact info
David Lopez
Law Office Of David Lopez
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Rubenstein
Represented By
Miriam Deborah Tauber
Miriam Tauber Law
contact info
David Lopez
Law Office Of David Lopez
contact info


Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago
Monday, November 04, 2024
51 51 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 11/04 12:24 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: The undersigned counsel for all parties hereby stipulate that this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party shall bear its own costs. So ordered. Motions terminated:47 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Voluntary Dismissal Following Execution of Settlement addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Miriam Tauber (Attorney for Plaintiffs) dated October 4, 2024. filed by Dennis J. Donoghue, Mark Rubenstein. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/4/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 02, 2024
50 50 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Sat 11/02 2:19 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) NextNav, Inc., Timothy M. Presutti, Wilbur Ed. Bosarge, Jr. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Dennis J. Donoghue, Mark Rubenstein. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Tauber, Miriam)
Related: [-]