Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Lisa G Wood
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:23-cv-00240
Nature of Suit430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Terminated:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 25, 2024 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Tala Amirfazli
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Grace Brennagh Callanan
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Rose Cook
Represented By
Justin T. Holcombe
Justin Tharpe Holcombe
contact info
Kris K. Skaar
Skaar & Feagle, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawrence W. Cook
Represented By
Justin T. Holcombe
Justin Tharpe Holcombe
contact info
Kris K. Skaar
Skaar & Feagle, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, August 09, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 08/09 2:23 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. This case stands closed. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/9/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
36 36 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/07 2:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jane Rose Cook, Lawrence W. Cook. (Holcombe, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Wed 07/17 2:04 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: The parties have informed the magistrate judge's courtroom deputy clerk via email that they have reached a settlement in this case. The video conference scheduled for Friday, July 19th is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/17/2024. (MD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 07/16 2:48 PM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray: Settlement Conference held on 7/16/2024. Following a productive mediation session today with the magistrate judge, the parties have elected to adjourn and reconvene via video conference on Friday, July 19, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Settlement Conference set for 7/19/2024 02:00 PM in SAV-MagVTC before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
minutes Status Conference Wed 07/10 4:00 PM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray: Pre-mediation Status Conference held by VTC on 7/10/2024. (MD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
31 31 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion to Stay Fri 06/07 2:25 PM
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference granting26 Motion for Joint Motion for Court-Directed Settlement Conference. This case has been set for a settlement conference before the undersigned on July 16, 2024, at 9:00 AM at the temporaryUnited States Courthouse at 8 Southern Oaks Ct., Savannah, GA 31405; granting27 Motion to Stay and staying all deadlines in this case pending the July 16, 2024 settlement conference. If this case remains pending after the settlement conference, the parties are directed to confer and submit a renewed Rule 26(f) Report no later than July 30, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 06/07/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 06/07 12:10 PM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray: Status Conference held by VTC on 6/7/2024. (MD)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 06/07 2:29 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing re31 Order Setting Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2024 09:00 AM in Savannah District Court 8 Southern Oaks Court, Courtroom Two, Savannah, GA before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Pre-mediation Status Conference set for 7/10/2024 02:00 PM in SAV-MagVTC before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Parties will be contacted by email with VTC (TEAMS) login instructions for the status conference. (MD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/06 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Feagle on behalf of Jane Rose Cook, Lawrence W. Cook (Feagle, James)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 06/06 8:34 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:26 MOTION for Settlement Conference. (jrb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing(VTC) Mon 06/03 10:22 AM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF HEARING BY ELECTRONIC MEANS: Status Conference set for 6/7/2024 11:00 AM in SAV-MagVTC before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray to discuss26 Joint Motion for Settlement Conference and27 Joint Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Settlement Conference. Parties will be contacted by email with VTC (TEAMS) login instructions. (MD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
27 27 motion Stay Thu 05/30 2:12 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Settlement Conference by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 6/13/2024.(Amirfazli, Tala)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
26 26 motion Hearing Thu 05/30 2:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 6/13/2024.(Amirfazli, Tala) Modified on 5/30/2024 (thb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Thu 05/30 2:54 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:27 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Settlement Conference. (thb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
25 25 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 05/09 9:10 AM
ORDER granting with modifications22 Joint Motion to Enter Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/9/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/09 9:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2024. Discovery due by 8/12/2024. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 11/12/2024. Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 12/13/2024. Motions due by 3/14/2025. Pretrial Order due by 5/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/9/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/09 10:40 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/20/2024. (thb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/07 2:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint for Damages by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Amirfazli, Tala)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Protective Order Tue 05/07 12:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Jane Rose Cook, Lawrence W. Cook. Responses due by 5/21/2024.(Holcombe, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 motion Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 05/07 11:47 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Holcombe, Justin)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 05/07 1:36 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting,22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (thb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
20 20 23 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 04/23 10:31 AM
ORDER denying re12 Motion to Compel. Further, Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint or, alternatively, to stay this case is DENIED as moot. The Parties are ORDERED to file their Rule 26(f) report within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 4/23/24. (loh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/16 4:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint, or, Alternatively, Stay This Action filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Amirfazli, Tala)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/31 1:56 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint, or, Alternatively, Stay This Action . Replies due by 2/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/31/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/30 2:29 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 Response in Opposition to12 Motion To Compel by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 2/13/2024.(Callanan, Grace) Modified on 1/30/2024 (csr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel
utility Motions Referred Tue 01/30 2:58 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 Response in Opposition to Motion To Compel. (csr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Intent Tue 01/23 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Intent to Reply by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re15 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Callanan, Grace)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/19 2:01 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint, or, Alternatively, Stay This Action filed by Jane Rose Cook, Lawrence W. Cook. (Holcombe, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/27 9:07 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Responses due by 1/19/2024. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/27/2023. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/26 4:57 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint, or, Alternatively, Stay This Action by Jane Rose Cook, Lawrence W. Cook. Responses due by 1/9/2024.(Holcombe, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
12 12 motion Compel Fri 12/15 2:56 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint, or, Alternatively, Stay This Action by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 12/29/2023.(Amirfazli, Tala)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Briefs Memorandum in Support
Thursday, November 30, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/30 10:39 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. Defendant is directed to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 15, 2023. (Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 12/15/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/30/2023. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/29 12:47 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 12/13/2023.(Callanan, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint
utility Motions Referred Wed 11/29 1:18 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (thb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/13 1:48 PM
ORDER granting re7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 12/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/13/23. (loh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/13 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin T. Holcombe on behalf of Jane Rose Cook, Lawrence W. Cook (Holcombe, Justin)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 11/13 8:30 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (csr)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/10 4:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/24/2023.(Amirfazli, Tala)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Friday, October 27, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/27 1:03 PM
ORDER granting Defendant's5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 11/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/27/2023. (ca)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/27 10:50 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/13/2023.(Amirfazli, Tala)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint
utility Motions Referred Fri 10/27 11:20 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint. (csr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/02 2:56 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Lisa G. Wood. Judge William T. Moore, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (pts)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 08/31 9:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (loh)
Related: [-]
2 2 8 pgs order Order Thu 08/31 9:22 AM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/31/23. (loh)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel (CLR Forms) Thu 08/31 9:17 AM
Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (loh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/31 9:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Lawrence W. Cook, Jane Rose Cook.(loh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 08/31 9:17 AM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3652868. (loh)
Related: [-]