Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:23-cv-00925
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2023
Terminated:Sep 01, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 26, 2024 2:37 AM CST
Defendant
HCA Healthcare, Inc.
Plaintiff
Lisa Warren
Represented By
Jalle H. Dafa
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, Llp (san Francisco)
contact info
Kenneth S. Byrd
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Mark P. Chalos
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, Llp (nashville Office)
contact info
Paul J. Doolittle
Poulin / Willey Anastopoulo, LLC
contact info
Jason Lichtman
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Michael W. Sobol
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Blake G. Abbott
Poulin / Willey Anastopoulo, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, September 01, 2023
8 8 4 pgs order Order Fri 09/01 4:28 PM
ORDER: This matter, having come before the Court by the Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases by their Motion to Consolidate Actions and Set Schedule for Appointment of Interim Co-lead Counsel and Filing of Consolidated Class Action Complaint (the "Motion") (Doc. No. 10 ), and the Court having reviewed the papers and for good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED as set forth below. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to administratively close all of the Related Actions except Silvers. Any initial case management conferences scheduled in the Related Actions are CANCELLED to be reset by the Magistrate Judge following entry of this Order. All future filings in the Consolidated Action shall be filed under the lead case number 3:23-cv-00684. Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Actions shall file an operative Consolidated Class Action Complaint within 45 days of the Order Appointing Leadership. Defendant's response to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint shall be due 45 days after the Consolidated Class Action Complaint is filed. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 08/23/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Fri 09/01 4:23 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: The Court has been notified that the following action is related to and should be consolidated with In re: HCA Healthcare, Inc. Data Security Litigation, Case No. 3:23-cv-00684 (the "Consolidated Action"). Warren v. HCA Healthcare, Inc., No. 3:23-cv-00925 (M.D. Tenn., filed August 30,2023). Pursuant to the Court's August 24, 2023 Order (Doc. No. 19 ), the above-listed related case ("Related Action") is hereby consolidated with In re HCA Healthcare, Inc. Data Security Litigation, Case No. 3:23-cv-00684. All future filings in the Related Action shall be filed in the Consolidated Action, case number 3:23-cv-00684.The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter a copy of this Order and the August 24, 2023 Order (Doc. No. 19 ) in the above-listed related case and administratively close that case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 09/01/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Fri 09/01 4:29 PM
All future filings in the Consolidated Action shall be filed under the lead case number 3:23-cv-00684. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 08/31 1:38 PM
Summons issued as to HCA Healthcare, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Thu 08/31 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/4/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Thu 08/31 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 08/31 1:29 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Thu 08/31 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 08/31 1:59 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark P. Chalos, Kenneth S. Byrd admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 08/31 2:05 PM
SC State Bar status verified as active for Blake G. Abbott, Paul J. Doolittle not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 08/31 2:06 PM
CA State Bar status verified as active for Michael W. Sobol, Jalle H. Dafa not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 08/31 2:07 PM
NY State Bar status verified as active for Jason Lichtman not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Thu 08/31 2:08 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Blake G. Abbott, Paul J. Doolittle, Jason Lichtman, Michael W. Sobol, Jalle H. Dafa: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/21/2023. (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/31 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against HCA Healthcare, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3901118), filed by Lisa Warren.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet