Arizona District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-08097
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2023
Last checked: Friday Sep 01, 2023 12:30 AM MST
Defendant
Shinowa Maria Gooday (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anthony William Church
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info

GPO Sep 22 2023
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Shinowa Maria Gooday. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 9/22/2023. (MRH)

Docket last updated: 09/13/2023 12:16 PM MST
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
1 1 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Shinowa Maria Gooday (1) count 1. (SMF)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
2 2 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles.No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza.No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Shinowa Maria Gooday. (SMF)
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Shinowa Maria Gooday. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary