Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Case #: 1:14-cv-03457
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2014
Terminated:May 06, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 8:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Nathan Hardwick IV, Esq.
Represented By
Robin N. Loeb
Garland Samuel & Loeb
contact info
John L. Bunyan
Carlock Copeland & Stair, Llp - Atl
contact info
Johannes Stuart Kingma
Carlock Copeland & Stair, Llp - Atl
contact info
Edward T. M. Garland
Garland Samuel & Loeb
contact info
Matthew Dennis Daley
Garland, Samuel & Loeb, P.C.
contact info
Peter Werdesheim
Carlock Copeland & Stair, Llp - Atl
contact info
Defendant
Morris Schneider Wittstadt, LLC
Represented By
Scott Eric Zweigel
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
William J. Holley, II
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mslaw, Inc.
Represented By
Scott Eric Zweigel
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
William J. Holley, II
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gerard Wm. Wittstadt Jr., Esq.
Represented By
Scott Eric Zweigel
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
William J. Holley, II
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark Wittstadt, Esq.
Represented By
Scott Eric Zweigel
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
William J. Holley, II
Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dustin Johnson
Represented By
Jason R. Dawson
Gordon & Rees, Llp -Sd Ca
contact info
Cecily J. McLeod
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Gallo
Barnes & Thornburg Llp -Ga
contact info
Wm. David Cornwell, Sr.
Barnes & Thornburg Llp -Ga
contact info
Kathleen L. Matsoukas
Barnes & Thornburg-In
contact info


1. Motion filed to dismiss D. Johnson's lawsuit | Golf Channel (golfchannel.com)
Submitted Thu 11/06/2014
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
137 137 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 09/06 9:38 AM
ORDER granting136 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/6/16. (hfm)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 09/06 8:25 AM
Submission of136 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint , submitted to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2016
136 136 motion Dismiss Fri 09/02 11:32 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Dustin Johnson.(Gallo, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Order