Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 1:23-cv-02396
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2023
Terminated:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 6:03 AM EST
Defendant
American Collections Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By
Philip John Collins
Protas Spivok And Collins LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ean McNaney
Represented By
Sergei Lemberg
Lemberg Law LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 14 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 6/14/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, October 17, 2024
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/17 11:48 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ean McNaney(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 10/17 3:12 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal at ECF No. 35, it is this 17th day of October 2024, ORDERED that the Stipulation of Dismissal shall be, and is hereby, APPROVED; and further it is ORDERED that the case shall be, and is hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 10/17/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 07/24 7:43 AM
QC NOTICE:32 and33 Certificates Regarding Discovery filed by American Collections Enterprise, Inc. were filed in error. **Pursuant to Local Rule 104.5, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, written discovery requests, responses thereto, notices of service of discovery requests or responses, depositions, and disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and (2) shall not be filed with the Court. The filings have been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document links have been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
33 33 service Certificate of Service Tue 07/23 4:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Collections Enterprise, Inc. Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Collins, Philip)
Related: [-]
32 32 service Certificate of Service Tue 07/23 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Collections Enterprise, Inc. Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories (Collins, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/18 11:14 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vlad Hirnyk. Directing attorney Vlad Hirnyk to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 7/18/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
30 30 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/17 4:01 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Vlad Hirnyk (Filing fee $100, receipt number BMDDC-11378799.) by Ean McNaney(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
29 29 3 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Mon 07/15 9:51 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/15/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 07/10 8:40 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for settlement. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/10/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 07/10 7:53 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Pursuant to the Initial Joint Status Report filed at ECF No. 26, the Rule 16 telephone conference scheduled for July 18, 2024 at 12:30 p.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/10/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
26 26 misc Status Report Tue 07/09 9:57 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Ean McNaney(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
25 25 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 06/26 6:05 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Collections Enterprise, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Collections Enterprise, Inc. for American Collections Enterprise, Inc..(Collins, Philip)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Supplement Wed 06/26 3:40 PM
(FILED IN ERROR) Supplement to (Collins, Philip) Modified on 6/26/2024 (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
22 22 4 pgs order Order Wed 06/26 1:42 PM
Discovery ORDER. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 6/26/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/26 1:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/8/2024. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 6/26/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 06/26 10:40 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by American Collections Enterprise, Inc..(Collins, Philip)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Wed 06/26 2:47 PM
Deficiency Notice to American Collections Enterprise, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 7/3/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 06/26 4:33 PM
QC NOTICE:23 Supplement filed by American Collections Enterprise, Inc. was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement under the "Other Documents" category and select the "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement" event. The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 06/14 8:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING as to the FDCPA claims pursuant to FDCPA §§ 1692e and 1692f set forth in Count I; and DENYING in all other respects. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 6/14/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
18 18 24 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 06/14 8:34 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 6/14/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/12 11:40 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ean McNaney.(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/22 11:39 AM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 11/22/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 11/16 10:17 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ean McNaney(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/14 2:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by American Collections Enterprise, Inc.(Collins, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 09, 2023
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/09 3:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Collections Enterprise, Inc., filed by Ean McNaney.(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Redline Copy
Monday, October 30, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 10/30 12:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint; American Collections Enterprise, Inc.'s answer due 11/3/2023. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 10/30/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 10/26 3:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by American Collections Enterprise, Inc.(Collins, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 19, 2023
10 10 respm Response Thu 10/19 5:06 PM
RESPONSE re 6 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by American Collections Enterprise, Inc..(Collins, Philip)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 10/19 4:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Collections Enterprise, Inc.(Collins, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Order
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/04 5:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ean McNaney. American Collections Enterprise, Inc. served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023.(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/21 12:38 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox no longer assigned to the case. (chs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
5 5 order 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause Wed 09/20 9:09 AM
ORDER directing Ean McNaney to show cause for failure to comply with[LINK:Standing Order 2019-07] . Show Cause Hearing set for 10/27/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox. This Order shall be vacated if Ean McNaney files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 9/20/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order 25 Pct Mag - Order Cancelling Show Cause Hearing Wed 09/20 4:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re:5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 9/20/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 09/05 11:56 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to American Collections Enterprise, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 25 Pct Mag - Case Management Order Tue 09/05 11:53 AM
Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 9/5/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Tue 09/05 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Maddox. Ean McNaney or counsel for Ean McNaney are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/19/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/01 8:04 AM
COMPLAINT against American Collections Enterprise, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10795898.), filed by Ean McNaney.(Lemberg, Sergei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons