Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-42027

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:23-ap-01073
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2023
Terminated:Feb 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael W. Gubbins
2345 Corporal Kennedy Street, Unit 1
Bayside, NY 11360
Represented By
Michael W. Gubbins
contact info
Plaintiff
Albanese Organization, Inc.
Represented By
Darren A Pascarella
Farrell Fritz PC
contact info
Domenique Camacho Moran
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info
Irene Zoupaniotis
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
River Terrace Associates, LLC
Represented By
Darren A Pascarella
Farrell Fritz PC
contact info
Domenique Camacho Moran
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info
Irene Zoupaniotis
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, February 01, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/01 2:15 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-1073 Closed (jag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
11 11 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Thu 01/11 8:23 AM
Stipulation and Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Signed on 1/10/2024. (jag)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Albanese Organization, Inc., Plaintiff River Terrace Associates, LLC
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/29 5:08 PM
Agreed Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding / Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Filed by Albanese Organization, Inc., River Terrace Associates, LLC. (Pascarella, Darren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 12/26 3:04 PM
Settled Without Hearin Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Albanese Organization, Inc., Plaintiff River Terrace Associates, LLC,10 Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Albanese Organization, Inc., Plaintiff River Terrace Associates, LLC
Monday, November 27, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Mon 11/27 5:35 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; 'Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 11/22 7:39 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by Plaintiff and Defendant - Appearance by Trustee - Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/27/2023 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Albanese Organization, Inc., Plaintiff River Terrace Associates, LLC
Monday, November 20, 2023
9 9 2 pgs misc Mediator's Report Mon 11/20 6:48 PM
Mediator's Report (Settled) . Filed by Lori Lapin Jones on behalf of Lori Lapin Jones (Jones, Lori)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 10/31 2:25 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: River Terrace Associates, LLC, Michael W. Gubbins, Albanese Organization, Inc. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/21/2023 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Monday, October 23, 2023
8 8 order Assigning Matter to Mediation Mon 10/23 12:55 PM
Order Assigning Matter to Mediation Related [+]. Signed on 10/23/2023. Mediator Selection Deadline due by 10/30/2023. (jag)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Thu 10/05 4:20 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/31/2023 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] Appearance by Plaintiff and Defendant - Court to enter Mediation Referral Order and to identify a mediator in two weeks and to hold first mediation session by 11/30/2023. (sej)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Albanese Organization, Inc., Plaintiff River Terrace Associates, LLC
Monday, October 02, 2023
7 7 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 10/02 2:44 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service of Debtor/Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint to Determine Non-Dischargability of Debt Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of Michael W. Gubbins Related [+] (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-] 6 Response filed by Defendant Michael W. Gubbins
6 6 9 pgs answer Response Mon 10/02 12:58 PM
Response Debtor/Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint to Determine Non-Dischargability of Debt Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of Michael W. Gubbins Related [+] (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Albanese Organization, Inc., Plaintiff River Terrace Associates, LLC
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/05 10:22 AM
Summons Served on Michael W. Gubbins 9/1/2023 . (Pascarella, Darren)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
4 4 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Fri 09/01 11:14 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Darren A Pascarella on behalf of Albanese Organization, Inc., River Terrace Associates, LLC Related [+] (Pascarella, Darren)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Albanese Organization, Inc., Plaintiff River Terrace Associates, LLC,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 09/01 1:05 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Albanese BPC LLC, NM Green LLC.Corporate Affiliates added to case:, AAA Realty II Partners LLC, NML Real Estate Holdings LLC, The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, VMA Realty II Partners LLC Filed by Darren A Pascarella on behalf of Albanese Organization, Inc., River Terrace Associates, LLC (Pascarella, Darren)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Fri 09/01 9:48 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Michael W. Gubbins Answer Due: 10/2/2023; Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/3/2023 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (ssw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/31 6:43 PM
Adversary case 1 23-01073 Complaint by Albanese Organization, Inc., River Terrace Associates, LLC against Michael W. Gubbins. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)). (Pascarella, Darren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 22 pgs Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit B - April 2022 Order
Att: 3 Exhibit C - May 2022 Judgment
Att: 4 Exhibit D - March 2023 Order
Att: 5 18 pgs Exhibit E - May 2023 Judgment
Att: 6 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet