Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-24046
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2023
Terminated:Sep 26, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 5:51 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
WILLIAM ROGERS
Represented By
ELIZABETH BLAIR SCHILLING
Fishman Haygood Llp - New Orleans La
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 01, 2023
2 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO COUNSEL - "CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 59 (Docketing Procedures for MSA Eligible Claimants and Administrative Docket Tolling Clarification) states that you must SELECT ONE OF THE FOLLOWING OFFICES ONLY: Pensacola Overflow One, Pensacola Overflow Two, or Pensacola Overflow Three. DO NOT SELECT Gainesville, Pensacola, Tallahassee, or Panama City." See ECF No. 3813 at 3-4. (djb)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-8125051.), filed by WILLIAM ROGERS. (SCHILLING, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet