Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Charles E Atchley, Jr
Referred: Jill E Mccook
Case #: 3:23-cv-00319
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 7:56 AM EST
Defendant
Knox County, Tennessee
Represented By
Houston Scott Havasy
Knox County Law Director'S Office
contact info
David S Wigler
Knox County Law Director'S Office
contact info
Rachel K. Harrison
Office Of County Attorney (knox)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronda Oellien
Represented By
Adam Strachn
Strachn Law, PLLC
contact info
Matthew Janson McClanahan
Tennessee (tn)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Oellien
Represented By
Adam Strachn
Strachn Law, PLLC
contact info
Matthew Janson McClanahan
Tennessee (tn)
contact info

GPO Jan 06 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER denying 35 Motionfor Oral Argument and Notice of Supplemental Authority; denying 30 Motion Revise Order Denying Knox County's Motion to Dismiss; denying 31 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 31 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 1/6/2024. (MKM)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
51 51 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/29 5:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Case by Ronda Oellien(as parents of minor child), Ronda Oellien(individually), Sean Oellien(as parents of minor child), Sean Oellien(individually). (Strachn, Adam)
Related: [-]