Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Referred: Renee Harris Toliver
Case #: 3:23-cv-01961
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2023
Terminated:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2024 3:21 AM CST
Defendant
Amazon FTW1
Represented By
Jason D Burns
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Amanda Ann Williams
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Scott Myers
2346 Belt Line Road PO Box 452061
Garland, TX 75045


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
109 109 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/12 9:11 PM
ORDER denying105 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief/Continuance/New Trial/Hearing/Conflict of Interest/Other. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 5/12/2025) (axm)
Related: [-]