Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Case #: 2:23-cv-01841
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2023
Terminated:Nov 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2024 1:20 AM MST
Defendant
Jeffery Crosland
Defendant
Serena Crosland
Defendant
Ty Ison
Plaintiff
Economy Premier Assurance Company
Represented By
Asha Sebastian
Christian Dichter & Sluga PC
contact info
Gena LoPresto Sluga
Christian Dichter & Sluga PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
9 9 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/14 1:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc.8 ), thisCivil Case is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action Tue 11/14 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Economy Premier Assurance Company. (Sluga, Gena)
Related: [-]
7 7 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/14 8:56 AM
PRELIMINARY ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on February 7, 2024, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/14/2023. (SLQ)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 09/01 11:24 AM
Summons Issued as to Jeffery Crosland, Serena Crosland, Ty Ison.(JAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Thursday, August 31, 2023
4 4 misc New Case Opened Fri 09/01 11:21 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22260110. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 23-1841 PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Submitted Fri 09/01 11:20 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Economy Premier Assurance Company. (Sluga, Gena)(JAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/01 11:19 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Economy Premier Assurance Company. (Sluga, Gena) (JAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/01 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22260110 filed by Economy Premier Assurance Company. (Sluga, Gena)(JAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet