Maryland District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-02311
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2023
Last checked: Monday Sep 04, 2023 3:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Eric Tano Tataw (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kathleen O Connell Gavin
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/11/2024 5:52 PM EDT
Friday, September 01, 2023
1 1 SEALED CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Eric Tano Tataw (1). (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Criminal Complaint
3 3 -SEALED- MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Eric Tano Tataw. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Eric Tano Tataw (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 8/31/2023. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Unseal Criminal Complaint by USA as to Eric Tano Tataw. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to Unseal Case as to Eric Tano Tataw (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/1/2023. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 Initial Appearance as to Eric Tano Tataw (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 9/1/2023 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite.(FTR Gold, CRD: Caitlyn Wilson, CTRM: 7B) (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Eric Tano Tataw (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Eric Tano Tataw. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/1/2023. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Eric Tano Tataw. Detention Hearing set for 9/8/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/1/2023. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER pursuant to Fed R Crim P 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act as to Eric Tano Tataw. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/1/2023. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]