Original Case: 2:22-cv-01651

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-55758
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2023
Terminated:Jan 25, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2024 3:13 AM PST
Petitioner - Appellee
SEAGUARD ELECTRONICS, LLC, a Nevada corporation
Represented By
Todd C. Theodora
Theodora Oringher, PC
contact info
Andrew Breidenbach
Theodora Oringher, PC
contact info
Samuel G. Fogas
Theodora Oringher, PC
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
VOXX INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, FKA Audiovox Corporation
Represented By
Mona Hanna
Michelman & Robinson, LLP
contact info
Jennifer A. Mauri
Michelman & Robinson, LLP
contact info
Reuben Alexander Ginsburg
Michelman & Robinson, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/29/2024 3:12 AM PST
Friday, September 01, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Voxx International Corporation Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/08/2023. Appellant Voxx International Corporation opening brief due 11/06/2023. Appellee Seaguard Electronics, LLC answering brief due 12/06/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12785721] (RT) [Entered: 09/01/2023 04:17 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 5 22 pgs Case Opening Packet