New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nina R Morrison
Referred: Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:23-cv-06606
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2024 4:46 AM EST
Defendant
Daniel Bendjy
Represented By
Hamutal Lieberman
Helbraun & Levey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Myo Moe
Represented By
Hamutal Lieberman
Helbraun & Levey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rangoon Restaurant Concepts LLC
Represented By
Hamutal Lieberman
Helbraun & Levey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sai Yan Naing
Represented By
Arthur H. Forman
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Pablo Ventura
Represented By
Arthur H. Forman
Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 31, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 01/31 3:57 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The telephone conference scheduled for 2/6/25 is adjourned to 6/10/25 at 10:00 AM before the Hon. Robert M. Levy, USMJ. Discovery deadline extended to 6/6/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/31/2025. (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 01/30 5:13 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Rangoon Restaurant Concepts LLC, Daniel Bendjy, Myo Moe. (Greenberg, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
minutes Status Conference Tue 10/08 11:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Joshua Androphy; Brianne Murphy, Melissa Greenberg. (1) Discovery slowed because new attorneys have entered the case. Discovery deadline extended to 2/14/25. Final, absent showing of good cause. (2) All parties shall respond to outstanding discovery requests by 10/29/24. (3) Next conference 2/6/25 at 10:30 (status) (same dial-in number and access code).Status Conference held on 10/8/2024 (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/11 7:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brianne E. Murphy on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Murphy, Brianne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/26 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa L. Greenberg on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Greenberg, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/20 9:02 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rangoon Restaurant Concepts LLC (Lieberman, Hamutal)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 06/20 12:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Joshua Androphy, Hamutal Lieberman. Settlement unlikely before completion of depositions.. Discovery deadline extended to 10/4/24. Next conference 10/8/24 at 11:00 (tel)(close of fact discovery).Status Conference held on 6/20/2024 (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
order Scheduling Order Wed 06/12 1:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The telephone conference set for 6/18/24 is adjouorned to 6/20/2024 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301, and use Guest ID #: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/12/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/10 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence F. Morrison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/10 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Androphy on behalf of Sai Yan Naing, Pablo Ventura (aty to be noticed) (Androphy, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Fri 05/03 10:52 AM
REPORT of Mediation Unsettled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 5/17/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Fri 05/03 3:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone status conference is scheduled for June 18, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. , before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 5/3/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
adr Selection of Mediator Fri 04/05 4:04 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Roger Briton selected as Mediator. Date Time and Location in-person/remote: May 2, 2024 (in person). Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation. For more details on the submission, please consult Local Civil Rule 83.8(b)(4). Attendance is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Mediators contact information can be found on the docket sheet. Within fourteen days of the conclusion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report. (JR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
adr Mediation Instructions Fri 03/22 12:00 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place (in-person or remote) of the first mediation session using the Selection of the Mediator Form on the ADR Forms website under Mediator Forms/For Counsel and Parties: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms or via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms under ADR Forms/Mediation Forms/For Counsel and Parties. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (JR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 03/20 11:22 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 6/3/24. Selection of Mediator due by 4/3/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/20/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Tue 03/19 12:32 PM
STATUS REPORT Requesting Referral to Mediation Panel by Sai Yan Naing, Pablo Ventura (Forman, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Tue 03/05 1:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Counsel present by telephone. Proposed case management order adopted. Close of discovery 9/12/24. Settlement explored. Counsel to advise in joint status report on or before 3/19/24 whether they would like a referral to the EDNY FLSA Mediation Panel.Initial Conference Hearing held on 3/r5/2024 (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Tue 03/05 1:24 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report re: mediation due by 3/19/2024.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/5/2024. (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
16 16 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 02/28 12:08 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Filed Jointly with Opposing Counsel by Sai Yan Naing, Pablo Ventura (Forman, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/16 1:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for March 5, 2024 at 1:00 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, USMJ. Parties are directed to dial (888) 684-8852; and use Access Code #: 6223489. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/16/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IC Questionnaire,
Att: 2 Individual Rules
Friday, January 12, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 01/12 4:46 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Lieberman, Hamutal)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/18 3:41 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 1/12/24. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/18/2023. (AM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/15 7:41 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re12 Amended Complaint by Rangoon Restaurant Concepts LLC. (Lieberman, Hamutal)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/06 10:57 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daniel Bendjy, Myo Moe, Rangoon Restaurant Concepts LLC, filed by Sai Yan Naing, Pablo Ventura. (Forman, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/03 10:14 AM
ORDER granting11 First Motion for Extension of Time until December 15, 2023 to Answer as to All Defendants . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/3/2023. (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/02 6:10 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Daniel Bendjy, Myo Moe, Rangoon Restaurant Concepts LLC. (Lieberman, Hamutal)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/02 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hamutal Lieberman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lieberman, Hamutal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/26 11:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sai Yan Naing, Pablo Ventura. Myo Moe served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/10/2023. (Forman, Arthur)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/26 11:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sai Yan Naing, Pablo Ventura. Daniel Bendjy served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/10/2023. (Forman, Arthur)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/26 11:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sai Yan Naing, Pablo Ventura. Rangoon Restaurant Concepts LLC served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/10/2023. (Forman, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 09/07 12:46 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 09/07 12:44 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 09/07 12:16 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (CV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 DANIEL BENDJY,
Att: 2 MYO MOE
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/07 11:43 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Nina R. Morrison and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Wed 09/06 9:22 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Ordered by Clerk of Court on 9/6/2023. (AM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
2 2 motion Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Tue 09/05 5:56 PM
MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Twice by Sai Yan Naing, Pablo Ventura. (Forman, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Payments
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/05 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Daniel Bendjy, Myo Moe, Rangoon Restaurant Concepts LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17052640 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Sai Yan Naing, Pablo Ventura. (Forman, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons "Rangoon Restaurant Concepts LLC",
Att: 3 Proposed Summons "Daniel Bendjy",
Att: 4 Proposed Summons "Myo Moe"