Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Stephen R Bough
Case #: 2:23-cv-04171
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Case in other court:In the Circuit Court of Pettis County, Missouri, 23PT-CC00125
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2024 3:55 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By
Christopher M. Harper
Franke, Schultz & Mullen - Kcmo
contact info
John L. Mullen
Franke, Schultz & Mullen - Kcmo
contact info
Counter Defendant
KDP Hospitality LLC
Represented By
J. Christopher Spangler
J. Christopher Spangler
contact info
Cale Chapman Spangler
Spangler Ward, LLC
contact info
Laurie S. Ward
contact info
Defendant
Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
8900 Ward Parkway
Kansas City, MO 64114
Represented By
Christopher M. Harper
Franke, Schultz & Mullen - Kcmo
contact info
John L. Mullen
Franke, Schultz & Mullen - Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
KDP Hospitality LLC
514 S. Ohio Ave
Sedalia, MO 65301
Represented By
J. Christopher Spangler
J. Christopher Spangler
contact info
Cale Chapman Spangler
Spangler Ward, LLC
contact info
Laurie S. Ward
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
19 19 order Order of Dismissal Tue 02/20 1:20 PM
Before the Court is a Dismissal with Prejudice. (Doc. #18.) Upon review, the dismissal is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed on 2/20/24 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/19 9:49 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal Joint by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Harper, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
17 17 order Order Mon 02/05 2:21 PM
Before the Court is a Joint Status Report. (Doc. #16.) Upon review, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed on 2/5/24 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 02/05 2:11 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Harper, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
15 15 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 01/05 10:48 AM
On December 8, 2023, the Court ordered that the parties file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report on or before January 8, 2024. A joint status report (Doc. #14) has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report on or before February 5, 2024. Signed on 1/5/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Status Report Fri 01/05 10:02 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Harper, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
13 13 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Fri 12/08 10:39 AM
The Court has been advised of the parties' intent to settle. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Further, in light of the settlement, the scheduling conference set for December 14, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby CANCELED. Signed on 12/8/23 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
12 12 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 11/17 3:54 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Harper, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 adr Designation of Neutral - Mediation and Assessment Program Fri 11/17 10:17 AM
DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming Charles Atwell(Harper, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Mon 11/13 11:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KDP Hospitality LLC filed by J. Christopher Spangler on behalf of Plaintiff KDP Hospitality LLC.(Spangler, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
9 9 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Wed 10/11 10:42 AM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS LOCAL RULE 7.1 filed by J. Christopher Spangler on behalf of Plaintiff KDP Hospitality LLC, Counter Defendant KDP Hospitality LLC.(Spangler, J.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Filing Wed 10/11 1:01 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
8 8 order Rule 16 Notice Tue 10/10 11:19 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/20/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/10/23 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 9:47 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Laurie S. Ward on behalf of KDP Hospitality LLC (Attorney Laurie S. Ward added to party KDP Hospitality LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie S. Ward added to party KDP Hospitality LLC(pty:cd))(Ward, Laurie)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 9:43 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Cale Chapman Spangler on behalf of KDP Hospitality LLC (Attorney Cale Chapman Spangler added to party KDP Hospitality LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Cale Chapman Spangler added to party KDP Hospitality LLC(pty:cd))(Spangler, Cale)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 misc Jury Demand Mon 09/18 10:34 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KDP Hospitality LLC. (Spangler, J.)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 09/18 10:25 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of KDP Hospitality LLC.(Spangler, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 09/13 3:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against KDP Hospitality LLC on behalf of Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(Harper, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Tue 09/05 8:50 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 09/05 8:38 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Pettis County, case number 23PT-CC00125, filed by Christopher M. Harper. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8605851.(Harper, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E