Maryland District Court
Judge:Ellen Lipton Hollander
Case #: 1:23-cv-02421
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2023
Terminated:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2024 5:50 AM EST
Defendant
David Scott Nutter
Represented By
Matthew M Bryant
Joseph Greenwald And Laake PA
contact info
Defendant
Pro Lawn Care, LLC
Represented By
Matthew M Bryant
Joseph Greenwald And Laake PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Hernandez-Messa
Represented By
Omar Vincent Melehy
Melehy And Associates LLC
contact info
Andrew G. Balashov
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, December 11, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/11 10:44 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 12/11/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/08 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Juan Hernandez-Messa (Balashov, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/04 10:12 AM
ORDER granting18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 12/4/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/01 5:53 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation by Juan Hernandez-Messa(Balashov, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
17 17 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 11/21 12:41 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by David Scott Nutter, Pro Lawn Care, LLC (Bryant, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order Mon 11/20 3:33 PM
LETTER ORDER to counsel re Local Rule 103.3; directing Pro Lawn to submit required disclosure statement by 12/5/2023. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 11/20/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document Thu 11/09 1:19 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 11/9/2023. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 11/09 12:35 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration to December 1, 2023 by Juan Hernandez-Messa(Balashov, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/07 9:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Hernandez-Messa.(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/07 9:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Hernandez-Messa. (Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
11 11 motion Dismiss Fri 11/03 11:12 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Litigation by David Scott Nutter, Pro Lawn Care, LLC(Bryant, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/03 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Bryant on behalf of David Scott Nutter, Pro Lawn Care, LLC (Bryant, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/19 3:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Hernandez-Messa. All Defendants.(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, September 22, 2023
order 25 Pct Mag - Order Cancelling Show Cause Hearing Fri 09/22 8:14 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re:5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/22/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/22 9:10 AM
Case reassigned to District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (chs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 order 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause Thu 09/21 8:27 AM
ORDER directing Juan Hernandez-Messa to show cause for failure to comply with[LINK:Standing Order 2019-07] . Show Cause Hearing set for 10/27/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Juan Hernandez-Messa files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/21/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
4 4 order 25 Pct Mag - Case Management Order Wed 09/06 1:52 PM
Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/6/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 09/06 1:37 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to David Scott Nutter, Pro Lawn Care, LLC.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Wed 09/06 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Juan Hernandez-Messa or counsel for Juan Hernandez-Messa are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/20/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/05 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Juan Hernandez-Messa ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10800969.), filed by Juan Hernandez-Messa.(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet