Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Susan E Schwab
Case #: 3:23-cv-01464
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2024 7:14 AM EST
Defendant
Dr. Loren J. Grossman, DMD
Represented By
Thomas A McCormack
Naulty Scaricamazza & Mcdevitt, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Steven Hippeli, DMD
Represented By
James A. Doherty, Jr.
Scanlon, Howley & Doherty, P.C.
contact info
Grace Doherty
Scanlon Howley & Doherty, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Reichart
Represented By
Matthew Miller
Meyerson And Miller
contact info
Jack A. Meyerson
Meyerson Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Theodore Reichart
Represented By
Matthew Miller
Meyerson And Miller
contact info
Jack A. Meyerson
Meyerson Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
28 28 misc Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 01/28 12:32 PM
WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Harry E Harnitchek terminated on behalf of DEFENDANTS, LOREN J. GROSSMAN, D.M.D. d/b/a GROSSMAN AND HIPPELI GENERAL AND COSMETIC DENTISTRY. (McCormack, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
27 27 misc Status Report Tue 12/17 4:17 PM
STATUS REPORT Re Settlement Discussions by Elizabeth Reichart, Theodore Reichart. (Meyerson, Jack)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/03 12:03 PM
ORDER - on or before December 18, 2024, the parties shall file a joint report advising the court of the status of settlement discussions and whether they are amenable to proceed to a settlement conference. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/3/24. (ae)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
24 24 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 08/05 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Harry E Harnitchek on behalf of Defendant Grossman (Harnitchek, Harry) Modified on 8/5/2024 (dw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
23 23 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/01 11:12 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Hippeli, DMD (Doherty, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
22 22 discov Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)3 - Pretrial Disclosures Wed 01/17 11:56 AM
DISCLOSURE REPORT by Loren J. Grossman, DMD by Loren J. Grossman, DMD.(McCormack, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
21 21 discov Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)3 - Pretrial Disclosures Mon 01/15 3:41 PM
DISCLOSURE REPORT by Elizabeth Reichart, Theodore Reichart by Elizabeth Reichart, Theodore Reichart.(Meyerson, Jack)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
20 20 discov Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)3 - Pretrial Disclosures Fri 12/22 2:28 PM
DISCLOSURE REPORT.(Doherty, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
19 19 misc Document Filed Fri 12/22 11:24 AM
Amswer by Steven Hippeli, DMD. to Plaintiffs' Complaint .(Doherty, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
18 18 order Case Management Order - Standard Track Tue 12/12 4:23 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Telephone Status Conference set for 8/30/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Fact Discovery due by 12/11/2024. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 2/1/2025. Defendant Expert Report is due by 4/1/2025. Supplemental Expert Reports due by 4/15/2025. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 6/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 12/12/23. (ae) (Main Document 18 replaced on 12/12/2023) (ae)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 12/12 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Doherty on behalf of Steven Hippeli, DMD(Doherty, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, December 04, 2023
15 15 misc Letter Mon 12/04 4:19 PM
Letter from All Counsel re: Joint Case Management Memo . (Miller, Matthew)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Case Management Plan Mon 12/04 4:17 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Elizabeth Reichart, Theodore Reichart. (Miller, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
13 13 misc Consents to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge in Direct Assignment Cases Tue 11/14 4:08 PM
CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Schwab in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2022-19. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 11/08 3:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Case management conference scheduled for November 13, 2023, is CANCELED. The case management conference is rescheduled to December 11, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 11/8/23. (ae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/18 11:34 AM
Defendants, Dr. Loren J. Grossman d/b/a Grossman and Hippeli General and Cosmetic Dentistry ANSWER to1 Complaint by Loren J. Grossman, DMD.(McCormack, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service COS for Defts Answer to Ptfs Complaint
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/03 2:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 10/3/23. (ae)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
9 9 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Mon 10/02 4:14 PM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Loren J. Grossman, DMD, Steven Hippeli, DMD, Elizabeth Reichart, Theodore Reichart YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 11/1/2023 (ae)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 09/29 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A McCormack on behalf of Loren J. Grossman, DMD (McCormack, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate Thu 09/28 9:15 AM
CERTIFICATE of Merit by Elizabeth Reichart, Theodore Reichart re1 Complaint . (Miller, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 09/27 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Doherty, Jr on behalf of Steven Hippeli, DMD(Doherty, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate Tue 09/19 11:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of Merit by Elizabeth Reichart, Theodore Reichart re1 Complaint . (Miller, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
misc Docket Annotation Thu 09/14 9:12 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Miller is instructed to file for special admission or make arrangements to be generally admitted. (ea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/13 5:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theodore Reichart, Elizabeth Reichart. Loren J. Grossman, DMD served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Miller, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/13 4:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theodore Reichart, Elizabeth Reichart. Steven Hippeli, DMD served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Miller, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/05 3:07 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/05 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6390143), filed by Theodore Reichart, Elizabeth Reichart.(ll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet