Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Glen H Davidson
Referred: David A Sanders
Case #: 1:23-cv-00117
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2023
Terminated:Jan 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2024 4:34 AM CST
Defendant
Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC
Represented By
Emily A. Warwick
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Courtney Leyes
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Gloria Richey
Represented By
Richard Shane McLaughlin
Mclaughlin Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/13 11:10 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal [joint] . (Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 01/08 8:34 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE by reason of settlement.. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/5/2024. (jla)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/08 1:08 PM
ORDER granting10 Defendant's Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC answer due 1/11/2024.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 12/8/2023. (tlr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/07 11:33 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint [unopposed] proposed order submitted by Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC. (Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/03 4:19 PM
ORDER granting7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC answer due 12/12/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/3/2023. (jtm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 10/02 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily A. Warwick on behalf of Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC (Warwick, Emily)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/02 2:34 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC. (Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 10/02 2:32 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC . (Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 10/02 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Courtney Leyes on behalf of Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC (Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/28 10:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Gloria Richey Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC served on 9/22/2023. (McLaughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 09/05 4:35 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/5/23. (jla)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/05 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Toyota Boshoku Mississippi, LLC. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/05 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2290177, filed by Gloria Richey. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Tue 09/05 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
Related: [-]