California Central District Court
Judge:Terry J Hatter, Jr
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:23-cv-07342
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2023
Terminated:May 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2024 1:46 AM PST
Defendant
Carniceria Los Compadres Meat Market, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen Edward Abraham
Law Offices Of Stephen Abraham
contact info
Defendant
Chung Soonkyo LLC
Represented By
Stephen Edward Abraham
Law Offices Of Stephen Abraham
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Raul Uriarte-Limon
Represented By
Matt D Valenti
Valenti Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/09 12:12 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.CIV.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii),22 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION, BE AND HEREBY IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all claims, causes of action, and parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close the file. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
22 22 stip Dismiss Case Mon 05/06 9:14 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.CIV.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon.(Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
21 21 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/16 5:01 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: In light of the notice of settlement, filed April 1, 2024, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. By JUNE 28, 2024 the parties shall file either a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment. Failure to timely file a stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment shall result in the dismissal of this action. All pending hearings and motions are now taken off calendar and vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
20 20 notice Settlement Mon 04/01 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
19 19 misc Response Fri 03/22 6:16 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limonto Order to Show Cause,,,,17 (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Declaration of Counsel
Thursday, February 22, 2024
18 18 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 02/23 11:57 AM
Order Setting Final Pre-trial Conference and Referring Discovery by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: It is Ordered, pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures and Local Rule 16, that the Final Pre-Trial Conference is placed on the Courts calendar for JULY 15, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 9C in the U. S. Courthouse on First Street. See order for more information. (shb)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 02/23 9:17 AM
Order to Show Cause by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, by March 25, 2024, as to why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claims Plaintiff may have alleged, if any. In responding to this order to Show cause, Plaintiff shall identify the amount of statutory damages. Plaintiff seeks to recover. Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel shall also, support their responses to this order to Show cause with declarations, signed under penalty of perjury, providing all facts necessary for the Court to determine if they satisfy the definition of a "high-frequency litigant," as provided by California Civil Procedure Code Sect 425,55(b)(1) & (2). Failure to timely or adequately respond to this order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal, without prejudice, of this entire case, or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and the other state law claims, if any, and the dismissal of the state law claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sect 1367(c). IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
16 16 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 12/26 1:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Carniceria Los Compadres Meat Market, Inc., Chung Soonkyo LLC, identifying No other interested parties. (Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12/26 1:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Carniceria Los Compadres Meat Market, Inc., Chung Soonkyo LLC.(Attorney Stephen Edward Abraham added to party Carniceria Los Compadres Meat Market, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Edward Abraham added to party Chung Soonkyo LLC(pty:dft))(Abraham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/01 3:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. upon Chung Soonkyo LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/26/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen E. Abraham, Esq.. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/01 3:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. upon Carniceria Los Compadres Meat Market, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/26/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen E. Abraham, Esq.. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 10/23 5:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon, upon Defendant Chung Soonkyo LLC served on 10/18/2023, answer due 11/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stephen Abraham, Esq. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 10/02 6:12 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon, upon Defendant Carniceria Los Compadres Meat Market, Inc. served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Oscar Doe; person in charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 09/12 12:30 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9C. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 10, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sun 09/10 5:59 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Carniceria Los Compadres Meat Market, Inc., Chung Soonkyo LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ChungSoonkyoLLC
Saturday, September 09, 2023
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sat 09/09 9:07 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sat 09/09 9:06 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sat 09/09 9:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/05 6:01 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon, (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 09/05 5:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 09/05 5:58 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 09/05 5:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/05 5:50 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35983395 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Attorney Matt D Valenti added to party Raul Uriarte-Limon(pty:pla))(Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]