Virginia Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth K Dillon
Referred: Joel C Hoppe
Case #: 5:23-cv-00057
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2023
Case in other court:Rockingham County Circuit Court, CL23-2237

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 11:59 PM EST
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
17 17 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/22 3:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 1/29/2025 09:00 AM in Harrisonburg before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. , CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/22/23. (kld)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 11/22 2:29 PM
ORAL ORDER finding as moot14 Motion to Amend/Correct. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on November 22, 2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (mc)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 11/22 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Bench Trial set for January 29, 2025 at 9:00 AM in Harrisonburg before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (mc)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Amend/Correct Wed 11/22 11:59 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Standard Scheduling Order by Nathan Thomas(Personal Representative of the Estate of Barbara L. Thomas, Deceased), Nathan Thomas(Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth G. Thomas, Deceased).(Southall, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order
13 13 misc Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan Wed 11/22 11:43 AM
Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Plaintiffs Nathan Thomas, Nathan Thomas (Southall, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 10/20 11:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Telephone Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2023. (kpa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/05 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Busby on behalf of Allstate Life Insurance Company (Busby, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/02 9:03 AM
ORAL ORDER granting9 MOTION for Jennifer M. Busby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 10/2/2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (jv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/29 6:40 PM
MOTION for Jennifer M. Busby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4274004. by Allstate Life Insurance Company. (Friedman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
3 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties.[LINK:Click here to access the Consent Form] (jv)
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to Allstate Life Insuance Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response.[LINK:Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form.] This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
Related: [-]
Elizabeth C. Southall, Esq., in accordance with Section C.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by updating the information in their PACER account and submitting to this court. Click[LINK:here] for PACER aid to updating your personal information, address information or email noticing. (jv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham County Circuit Court, case number CL23-2237. (Filing & Administrative fee $402, receipt number AVAWDC-4258221), filed by Allstate Life Insuance Company.(jv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. State Court Filings,
Att: 3 Exhibit B. State Corporation Commission, Clerk's Information System