Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-24142
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2023
Terminated:Oct 16, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 04, 2024 5:04 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
DARRYL A. ALEXANDER
Represented By
MICHAEL EDWARD PEDERSON
Weitz & Luxenberg Pc - New York Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, September 07, 2023
3 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO COUNSEL - "CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 59 (Docketing Procedures for MSA Eligible Claimants and Administrative Docket Tolling Clarification) states that you must SELECT ONE OF THE FOLLOWING OFFICES ONLY: Pensacola Overflow One, Pensacola Overflow Two, or Pensacola Overflow Three. DO NOT SELECT Gainesville, Pensacola, Tallahassee, or Panama City." See 3:19-md-2885-MCR-HTC, ECF No. 3813 at 3-4. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PEDERSON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-8137693.), filed by DARRYL A. ALEXANDER. (PEDERSON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]