Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Referred: Christopher J Burke
Case #: 1:23-cv-00976
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2023
Terminated:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2024 4:52 AM EST
Defendant
Pelco, Inc.
Represented By
Jeremy A. Tigan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Portus Pty Ltd.
Represented By
Richard Charles Weinblatt
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info
Stamatios Stamoulis
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.
Represented By
Richard Charles Weinblatt
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info
Stamatios Stamoulis
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, August 08, 2024
20 20 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 08/08 9:09 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,914,526 B1; US 9,961,097 B2.(ceg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation of Dismissal
19 19 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/08 9:05 AM
SO ORDERED, re18 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 8/8/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/07 5:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
order SO ORDERED Wed 06/26 9:37 AM
SO ORDERED, D.I.17 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay All Deadlines filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 06/26/2024. (smg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Tue 06/25 7:15 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay All Deadlines by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
16 16 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/03 9:54 AM
ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to any including summary judgment, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 23-976-JLH-CJB. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/3/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 05/03 1:38 PM
Remark: The parties should follow the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, a copy of which is found on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's webpage:[LINK:https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/CJBCC2022.pdf] Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00851-JLH-CJB, 1:23-cv-00976-JLH-CJB, 1:23-cv-00977-JLH-CJB(smg)
Related: [-]
utility Remark re Newer Attorneys Fri 05/03 1:38 PM
Remark: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:[LINK:http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf] Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00851-JLH-CJB, 1:23-cv-00976-JLH-CJB, 1:23-cv-00977-JLH-CJB(smg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 04/26 9:29 AM
SO ORDERED, re15 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant Pelco, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 27, 2024. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Pelco, Inc. answer due 6/27/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/26/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 04/25 10:25 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Pelco, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to June 27, 2024 - filed by Pelco, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 03/19 8:34 AM
SO ORDERED, re14 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant Pelco, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 13, 2024. (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Pelco, Inc. answer due 5/13/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/19/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
14 14 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 03/18 7:19 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Pelco, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to May 13, 2024 - filed by Pelco, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 01/25 2:19 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Pelco, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to March 29, 2024 - filed by Pelco, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 01/25 3:44 PM
SO ORDERED, re13 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant Pelco, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 29, 2024. (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Pelco, Inc. answer due 3/29/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/25/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 01/09 12:20 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00851-RGA, 1:23-cv-00976-RGA, 1:23-cv-00977-RGA(nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
order SO ORDERED Mon 12/18 8:57 AM
SO ORDERED, re12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manoj Gandhi, filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/2023. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/15 6:03 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manoj Gandhi - filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 11/15 9:25 AM
SO ORDERED, re11 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Pelco, Inc. answer due 1/29/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/15/2023. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 11/14 6:16 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Pelco, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to January 29, 2024 - filed by Pelco, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
order SO ORDERED Tue 10/10 10:59 AM
SO ORDERED, re9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer C. Tempesta, filed by Pelco, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/10/2023. (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 10/10 11:49 AM
SO ORDERED, re10 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Pelco, Inc. answer due 11/29/2023). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/10/2023. (nms)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Tue 10/10 12:11 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The deficiency notice issued on 10/10/2023, has been removed from the docket as it was filed in error. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
10 10 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 10/06 5:09 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Pelco, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to November 29, 2023 - filed by Pelco, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/06 5:08 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer C. Tempesta - filed by Pelco, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 09/27 11:49 AM
SO ORDERED, re7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Pelco, Inc. answer due 10/30/2023). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/27/2023. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 09/26 6:22 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Motorola Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate Vanguard Group for Pelco, Inc. filed by Pelco, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 09/26 6:19 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Pelco, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to October 30, 2023 - filed by Pelco, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/13 12:09 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00976-RGA, 1:23-cv-00977-RGA (rjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/08 11:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Portus Singapore Pte Ltd., Portus Pty Ltd..Pelco, Inc. served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 09/06 8:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Pelco, Inc. on 9/5/2023. (mpb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Wed 09/06 8:38 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. for Portus Pty Ltd. filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. (mpb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Wed 09/06 8:36 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,914,526 B1 ;US 9,961,097 B2. (mpb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 09/06 8:35 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/06 8:34 AM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Pelco, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4216508.) - filed by Portus Singapore Pte Ltd., Portus Pty Ltd..(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet