Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John F Murphy
Case #: 2:23-cv-03472
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 04, 2024 5:13 AM EST
Defendant
RAD DIVERSIFIED
Represented By
KELLY DOBBS BUNTING
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Taylor Miller
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOE MALONEY
Represented By
DAVID M. KOLLER
Koller Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 02/20 1:51 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 2/20/24. 2/20/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 02/20 8:59 AM
Letter dated February 20, 2024 by JOE MALONEY. (KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Scheduling Order Wed 11/08 8:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR ALL SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/26/2024. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 4/22/2024. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 11/8/23. 11/8/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Wed 11/08 3:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY RULE 16 Conference held on 11/8/23. (JL)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Report Of Wed 11/08 1:00 PM
Report Of Rule 26f Meeting AMENDED (Joint Report) by JOE MALONEY. (KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
9 9 misc Report Of Wed 11/01 6:17 PM
Report Of Rule 26f Meeting (Joint Report) by JOE MALONEY. (KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/12 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Miller on behalf of RAD DIVERSIFIED with Certificate of Service(Miller, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
7 7 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 10/11 3:44 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RAD DIVERSIFIED.(BUNTING, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/10 5:49 PM
ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 11/8/2023 AT 03:00 PM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 10/10/23. 10/10/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/09 5:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by RAD DIVERSIFIED.(BUNTING, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Wed 09/20 3:12 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RAD DIVERSIFIED SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/9/23 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 9/20/23. 9/20/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Stipulation Wed 09/20 2:08 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney) for Extension of Time by RAD DIVERSIFIED. (BUNTING, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/07 12:43 PM
Summons Issued as to RAD DIVERSIFIED. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 9/7/23 (va)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 09/06 7:44 PM
COMPLAINT against RAD DIVERSIFIED ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16926079.), filed by JOE MALONEY.(KOLLER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form