Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:23-mj-06200
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2023
Terminated:Aug 23, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Sep 07, 2023 2:37 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Angie E. Danis
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Nichole Cheri Birr (1)
Terminated: 08/23/2023
Represented By
St. Louis Fed Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - St Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/07/2023 2:54 AM CDT
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
Warrant Issued as to Complaint in case as to Nichole Cheri Birr. (DLB)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Nichole Cheri Birr (1). On August 8, 2023, the warrant application(s) of the government, any complaint, probable cause affidavit, warrant, and any related motion(s) and order(s) were initially submitted to the undersigned U. S. Magistrate Judge by reliable electronic means in the referenced case. By reliable electronic means the affiant swore to the undersigned Magistrate Judge that the foregoing of each document is true and correct. The executed documents were forwarded to the Clerk of Court for filing, with a copy to the Assistant United States Attorney for the agent or officer who submitted them. /s/ Patricia L. Cohen, U.S. Magistrate Judge, E. D. Mo. August 8, 2023. (DLB)
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Nichole Cheri Birr1 Complaint,,(DLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
3 3 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Angie E. Danis appearing for USA. (DLB)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Hearing by USA as to Nichole Cheri Birr. (DLB)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION FOR SEALING ORDER by USA as to Nichole Cheri Birr. (DLB)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting 5 MOTION FOR SEALING ORDER as to Nichole Cheri Birr (1) - On motion of the United States of America, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the complaint, along with its affidavit, and arrest warrant, and this Order issued thereto, be sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on August 8, 2023. (DLB)
Related: [-]