Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:23-bk-11388
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Dec 21, 2023
Claims Deadline:Dec 12, 2023
Converted:Oct 03, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Off Lease Only LLC
1200 S. Congress Ave.
Palm Springs, FL 33406
Represented By
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Steven Ma
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Ashley M. Weringa
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Reuven C Klein
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Megan R. Volin
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Brian S Rosen
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Christian J Palacios
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Stretto
www.stretto.com 410 Exchange, Ste 100
Irvine, CA 92602
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
L. Katherine Good
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Aaron H. Stulman
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
Trustee
Don A. Beskrone
Ashby & Geddes P.O. Box 272
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Gregory A. Taylor
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Linda Richenderfer
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/11/2024 1:24 PM EST
Thursday, September 07, 2023
court Case Assigned Thu 09/07 2:47 PM
Judge Craig T Goldblatt added to case (SJS)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Thu 09/07 4:30 PM
Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Schepacarter, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 09/07 2:10 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Off Lease Only LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix
2 2 13 pgs motion Joint Administration - Motion Thu 09/07 3:17 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Request for Service of Notices Thu 09/07 3:22 PM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by McCrystal Law Offices. (McCrystal, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 43 pgs first Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion Thu 09/07 4:09 PM
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion Declaration of Leland Wilson in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Pleadings Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent Thu 09/07 4:17 PM
Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent STRETTO Filed By Off Lease Only LLC(Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Betance Declaration
6 6 motion Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts Thu 09/07 4:23 PM
Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts MOTION OF THE DEBTORS FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS (I) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO (A) CONTINUE TO OPERATE THEIR CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND (B) MAINTAIN EXISTING BUSINESS FORMS, AND (II) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
7 7 17 pgs motion Approve Use of Cash Collateral - Motion Thu 09/07 4:23 PM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral // Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Scheduling A Final Hearing, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed By Off Lease Only LLC(Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Interim Order
8 8 35 pgs motion Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims Thu 09/07 4:34 PM
Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Motion to Continue Customer Programs Thu 09/07 4:39 PM
Motion to Continue Customer Programs Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of the Debtors Customer Programs and Sale Programs, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Motion Thu 09/07 4:44 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Off Lease Only LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
11 11 29 pgs motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Thu 09/07 4:52 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Maintain Existing Insurance Policies and the Surety Bond Program and Pay All Obligations Arising Thereunder and (B) Continue Their Insurance Premium Financing Program; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
12 12 17 pgs motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Thu 09/07 4:56 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated Creditor Matrix, (B) File a Consolidated Top 20 Creditors List, and (C) Redact Certain Personally Identifiable Information for Individual Creditors; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
13 13 20 pgs motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Thu 09/07 5:01 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors First (1st) Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing Rejection of Certain Unexpired Leases and (B) Granting Related Relief Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes Thu 09/07 5:04 PM
Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition and Postpetition Taxes and Fees and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
15 15 39 pgs motion Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Thu 09/07 5:09 PM
Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Approving Debtors Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment, (II) Establishing Procedures for Resolving Objections by Utility Companies, (III) Prohibiting Utility Companies from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion to Pay Employee Wages Thu 09/07 5:13 PM
Motion to Pay Employee Wages Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Other Compensation, and Reimbursable Expenses, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Off Lease Only LLC (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]