Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-11138

Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Jimmy L Croom
Case #: 1:23-ap-05046
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2023
Terminated:Oct 19, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Weekly Pay Auto Sales
1090 South Highland
Jackson, TN 38301
Represented By
Weekly Pay Auto Sales
contact info
Plaintiff
Haven Sanks
799 East Main St.Apt A
Jackson, TN 38301
Represented By
Robert B. Vandiver, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Saturday, December 16, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Sat 12/16 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Court's Certificate Of Mailing
Thursday, December 14, 2023
7 7 court Court's Certificate Of Mailing Thu 12/14 3:40 PM
Courts Certificate Of Mailing. Service To Debtor/Plaintiff Listed On The Certificate Of Service On The Related Document Related [+] (srb)
Related: [-] 4 Order (Adversary)
Thursday, October 19, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/19 8:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-5046 Closed (srb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 07, 2023
6 6 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Sat 10/07 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order (Adversary)
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Sat 10/07 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order (Adversary)
Thursday, October 05, 2023
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Adversary) Thu 10/05 11:54 AM
Order Resolving AND Notice of Entry of Judgment Related [+] (srb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, September 28, 2023
court Minutes Thu 09/28 1:00 PM
Minutes; Disposition: CONSENT ORDER. Order to be prepared by Robert Vandiver, Jr. Notice Of Expedited Hearing Related [+]. Order due by 10/12/2023. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-05046 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by Haven Sanks against Weekly Pay Auto Sales
Saturday, September 09, 2023
3 3 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Sat 09/09 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice Of Expedited Hearing
Thursday, September 07, 2023
2 2 notice Notice Of Expedited Hearing Thu 09/07 10:15 AM
Notice Of Expedited Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled 9/28/2023 at 10:00 AM, Room 342, Jackson, TN . (dap)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-05046 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by Haven Sanks against Weekly Pay Auto Sales.
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/06 4:17 PM
Adversary case 23-05046 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by Haven Sanks against Weekly Pay Auto Sales. (Vandiver, Robert)
Related: [-]