Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:23-cv-23412
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2023
Terminated:Apr 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 05, 2024 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Represented By
Dayle Marie Van Hoose
Sessions, Israel & Shartle, LLC
contact info
Rachel Megan Fleishman
Sessions, Israel And Shartle, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Jason Daniel Joffe
Squire Sanders & Dempsey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
TransUnion, LLC
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Charlotte Ann Long
Trans Union, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Hin Man Poon
Represented By
Joel David Lucoff
Joel David Lucoff
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc.
Terminated: 10/26/2023
Represented By
Leonor Maria Lagomasino
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, May 16, 2024
49 49 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Thu 05/16 11:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hin Man Poon (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
48 48 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Party ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Thu 04/18 3:12 PM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. All pending motions and deadlines are DENIED as MOOT and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
47 47 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 04/18 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hin Man Poon (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
46 46 order Administrative Order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 04/18 11:17 AM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for statistical purposes only. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
45 45 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 04/18 11:08 AM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC only re DE34 which states that Plaintiff and Defendant Trans Union have settled. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
44 44 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set Response/Answer Due Deadline Thu 04/18 11:01 AM
ORDER ON FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE re26 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. response/answer due 5/2/2024. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
43 43 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 04/18 10:55 AM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. only. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
42 42 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 04/18 10:51 AM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Mon 02/19 12:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., Only by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Fleishman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
40 40 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Fri 02/16 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Hin Man Poon (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 01/04 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hin Man Poon (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
38 38 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Fri 11/17 9:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC by TransUnion, LLC(Long, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 26, 2023
37 37 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 10/27 12:39 PM
FINAL ORDER Dismissing Case as to Party(ies) McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc. (With Prejudice) , and all pending motions between these parties are Denied as Moot. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 10/26 6:07 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hin Man Poon (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
35 35 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 10/23 9:10 AM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT'S MCCARTHY, BURGESS & WOLF, INC. AND TRANSUNION, LLC ONLY. Plaintiff's Notices of Settlement with Defendant McCarthy, Burgess & Wolf, Inc. (ECF No.16 ), and TransUnion, LLC, (ECF No.34 ), which state that the Plaintiff and Defendants have reached a settlement. Plaintiff and Defendants shall file Stipulations of Dismissal and any other documents necessary to conclude this action on or before November 19, 2023.All pending Deadlines are Vacated as to Defendants McCarthy, Burgess & Wolf, Inc. and TransUnion, LLC only. The Clerk is Directed to Deny any pending motions between Plaintiff and Defendants McCarthy, Burgess & Wolf, Inc. and TransUnion, LLC as Moot. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/20/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
34 34 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 10/19 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to TRANSUNION, LLC by Hin Man Poon (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Tue 10/17 3:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S DEFAULT, granting31 Motion to Vacate31 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate28 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default and to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/16/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/16 10:06 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC (Long, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Tue 10/17 3:45 PM
Reset Answer Due Deadline: TransUnion, LLC answer due 10/19/2023. Per d.e.33 Order. (mee)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
31 31 motion Vacate Fri 10/13 7:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Vacate28 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default and to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by TransUnion, LLC. Attorney Charlotte Ann Long added to party TransUnion, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/27/2023(Long, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
30 30 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Fri 10/13 8:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address and email information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney Leonor Maria Lagomasino. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
29 29 notice Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name Thu 10/12 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Leonor Maria Lagomasino (Lagomasino, Leonor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
28 28 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Wed 10/11 4:00 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to TransUnion, LLC - Motions Terminated:27 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/11/2023. (ebz)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 10/11 7:53 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to TransUnion, LLC by Hin Man Poon. (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
26 26 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Tue 10/10 1:52 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/10/2023. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Striking Mon 10/09 7:49 AM
NOTICE of Striking23 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. filed by HIN MAN POON by HIN MAN POON (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
24 24 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 10/06 12:51 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by HIN MAN POON. (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 10/06 12:44 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. by HIN MAN POON. (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 10/02 1:50 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roy K. Altman recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jose E. Martinez for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/29/2023. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/02 12:33 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIN MAN POON (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 10/02 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayle Marie Van Hoose on behalf of Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. Attorney Dayle Marie Van Hoose added to party Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.(pty:dft). (Van Hoose, Dayle)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/02 11:37 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Convergent Resources, Inc. for Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Fleishman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/02 11:35 AM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. Attorney Rachel Megan Fleishman added to party Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.(pty:dft). (Fleishman, Rachel)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/02 10:55 AM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 09/28 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to MCCARTHY, BURGESS & WOLFF, INC by HIN MAN POON (Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 09/28 11:55 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time AND Defendant McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc.'s14 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. As we directed the parties in our4 Order in Cases with Multiple Defendants, "[t]he Defendants shall file their responses and motions jointly " unless they first file a "motion for leave to file separate responses or motions." Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/28/2023. (tbr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 09/27 6:50 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc.. (Lagomasino, Leonor)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 09/27 6:48 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leonor Maria Lagomasino on behalf of McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc.. Attorney Leonor Maria Lagomasino added to party McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc.(pty:dft). (Lagomasino, Leonor)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/27 5:00 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 09/27 4:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Jason Daniel Joffe added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time
Thursday, September 07, 2023
3 3 Summons Issued as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., McCarthy, Burgess & Wolff, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (nan)
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16899910, filed by HIN MAN POON.(Lucoff, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s),
Att: 4 Summon(s),
Att: 5 Summon(s),
Att: 6 Summon(s),
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet