Washington Western District Court
Judge:Barbara J Rothstein
Case #: 2:23-cv-01386
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2023
Terminated:Feb 27, 2024
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 23-00002-14276-4-SEA
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 05, 2024 12:37 AM PST
Defendant
Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Represented By
Sandra J Badin
Robins Kaplan Llp (ma)
contact info
Tarin Schalow
Bullivant Houser Bailey (sea)
contact info
Jared Kiess
Bullivant Houser Bailey (sea)
contact info
Melissa M D'Alelio
Robins Kaplan Llp (ma)
contact info
Plaintiff
Washington State Convention Center Public Facilities District
Represented By
Jason R. Donovan
Foster Garvey Pc (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
25 25 appeal Mandate of USCA Tue 12/17 4:24 PM
MANDATE OF USCA 24-1889 as to22 Notice of Appeal, filed by Washington State Convention Center Public Facilities District,24 Memorandum from USCA. The judgment of this Court, entered November 25, 2024, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. AFFIRMED . (RE)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
24 24 appeal Memorandum/Opinion from USCA Wed 11/27 11:51 AM
MEMORANDUM FROM USCA 24-1889 (NOT THE MANDATE) as to22 Notice of Appeal, filed by Washington State Convention Center Public Facilities District. AFFIRMED . (RE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
23 23 appeal Time Schedule Order Appeal Number from USCA Thu 03/28 5:24 PM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER 24-1889 as to22 Notice of Appeal, filed by Washington State Convention Center Public Facilities District. (RE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
22 22 appeal Notice of Appeal to Circuit Tue 03/26 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re21 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Terminated Case by Plaintiff Washington State Convention Center Public Facilities District. $605, receipt number AWAWDC-8405190 (cc: USCA)(Donovan, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Representation Statement
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
21 21 16 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 02/27 10:58 AM
ORDER granting Defendant's13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
20 20 misc BJR Standing Order (FORM) Wed 01/31 11:40 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. (NAW)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned to Judge Wed 01/31 9:20 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents filed in this case must bear the cause number 2:23-CV-1386-BJR. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Thu 01/11 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re17 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Washington State Convention Center Public Facilities District(Donovan, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/10 12:39 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, TO RESPONSE to13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Kiess, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
17 17 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/18 4:25 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Washington State Convention Center Public Facilities District, to13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Donovan, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/11 12:07 PM
ORDER granting Parties'15 Stipulated MOTION Re-note of Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No.13 ) is re-noted on the Motion Calendar for 1/10/2024. The response and reply deadlines are extended as follows: deadline to file Response is 12/18/2023, deadline to file Reply is 1/10/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulated Motion Mon 12/11 11:01 AM
Stipulated MOTION Re-Note of Motion to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order , filed by Plaintiff Washington State Convention Center Public Facilities District. Noting Date 12/11/2023, (Donovan, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
14 14 respm Declaration Mon 10/23 3:55 PM
DECLARATION of Jared F. Kiess filed by Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(Kiess, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/23 3:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 12/15/2023, (Kiess, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 13, 2023
12 12 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 4:05 PM
ORDER re10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sandra J Badin for Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 4:02 PM
ORDER re9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melissa M D'Alelio for Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 9:52 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sandra J. Badin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8200363 (Kiess, Jared)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 9:49 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melissa M. DAlelio FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8200352 (Kiess, Jared)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/14 10:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Parties'7 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Answer and Initial Discovery Deadlines. Defendant's deadline to answer complaint if Plaintiff does not file a motion to remand is 10/23/2023. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
7 7 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 09/13 3:26 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Extend Answer and Initial Discovery Deadlines , filed by Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. Noting Date 9/13/2023, (Kiess, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
6 6 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 09/12 3:25 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. for Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. (Kiess, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
5 5 order JCC-Interim JSR Minute Order Mon 09/11 11:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation. The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/23/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/30/2023, Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2023. (KMP)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM) Mon 09/11 11:22 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
3 3 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Fri 09/08 11:09 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (JWC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 09/08 11:06 AM
U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (JWC)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Fri 09/08 11:10 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/15/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (JWC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
2 2 misc Verification of State Court Records Thu 09/07 4:07 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau (Kiess, Jared)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 09/07 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23 2-14276 4-SEA; Related [+] filed by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau.(Kiess, Jared)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8154910
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Remaining King County Superior Court filed documents