Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-04344
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2023
Case in other court:Massachusetts, 1:23-cv-11675
Last checked: Sunday Feb 25, 2024 4:10 AM EST
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Kevin P. Polansky
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501
Defendant
The 3M Company
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
E. I. DuPont De Nemours & Company
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Company
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
AGC Inc
Defendant
Angus Fire
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Kevin P. Polansky
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
Plaintiff
Town of Kingston
Represented By
Philip F Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Carla Burke Pickrel
Baron & Budd, P.C.
contact info
Darren D Sumich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Luana N Smith
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
David A Parsiola
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Jason J Julius
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Cary L McDougal
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Richard M. Sandman
Rodman Rodman & Sandman
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Brandon J Taylor
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Andrew J Cvitanovic
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Christina Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/14 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Town of Kingston Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04344-RMG(Summy, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/17 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, September 11, 2023
15 15 service Summons Issued Mon 09/11 3:07 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
14 14 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 09/07 1:06 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts (associated as of 8/29/2023), 1:23-cv-11675, Town of Kingston v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04344-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
12 12 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 09/07 12:58 PM
Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:23-cv-11675. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
11 11 Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 8/23/2023. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Belpedio, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
10 10 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 149 in MDL Case 2873 received from the District of South Carolina requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Belpedio, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
9 9 STATE COURT Record. (Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
8 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleadings to 28 days following the JPML issuing a decision on whether to transfer this action to MDL 2873. (Folan, Karen) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
7 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleadings by Tyco Fire Products, LP.(Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
6 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Cook, Savannah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(MacDonald, Gail) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
4 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Quilter, Madison) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cook, Savannah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CHEMGUARD INC., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHEMGUARD INC., Tyco Fire Products, LP ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9963525 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/7/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Category Form,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet