Village of Maybrook v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04479 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 7:23-cv-06547 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 04, 2024 5:12 AM EST |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation, f/k/a UTC Fire & Security Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Village of Maybrook
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, The 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). List of cases for dismissal)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 09/07 1:52 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 9/6/2023), 7:23-cv-06547, Village of Maybrook v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04479-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:23-cv-06547. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/7/2023.] | ||
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew Foster Bain. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: THE 3M COMPANY, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., BASF CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc.. CLARIANT CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation, CORTEVA, INC., individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, DUPONT DE NEMOURS INC., individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterpr, E. I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS, LP, individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted, party text was omitted. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/7/2023.] | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrew Foster Bain re: Document No. 1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/7/2023.] | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/7/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/7/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/7/2023.] | ||
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents BASF Corporation, Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours Inc., E. I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC,, Tyco Fire Products, LP, Doe Defendants 1-20 added. Party added pursuant to1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. Related document:1 Notice of Removal,..(Bain, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/7/2023.] | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |