Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Case #: 6:23-cr-00133
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: Friday Sep 08, 2023 2:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Miranda Morgan Pauley (1)
Represented By
Rhyder Murree Jolliff
Federal Public Defender - Muskogee
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan Bondura
Us Attorney (oked)
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/08/2023 3:41 AM CDT
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
1 1 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET(S) by USA as to Miranda Morgan Pauley. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 INDICTMENT by USA as to Miranda Morgan Pauley (1) count(s) 1. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #2 per Local Rule, (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 WARRANT Issued by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson as to Miranda Morgan Pauley. (rak, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/10/2023) (rak, Deputy Clerk).
Related: [-]
5 5 APPLICATION/ORDER/WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson for the appearance forthwith as to Miranda Morgan Pauley. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]