California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 5:23-cv-04613
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:25 AM PST
Defendant
Tesla Motors, Inc.
Represented By
Krista Marie Carter
Tesla, Inc.
contact info
Joseph C Alm
Tesla, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Safety Direct LLC
Represented By
Karthik Krishna Murthy
Murthy Patent Law Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 08, 2023
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT against tesla motors, inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18624705.). Filed bysafety direct llc.(Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit