California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:23-cv-04615
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Case in other court:Santa Clara County Superior Court, 23CV415679
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:25 AM PST
Defendant
Terex Corporation
Represented By
Kourtney M Speer
Bowles & Verna LLP
contact info
William T. Nagle
Bowles & Verna
contact info
Defendant
United Rentals (North America), Inc.
Sutton & Murphy 26056 Acero
Mission Viejo, CA 92691
Represented By
Michael Scott Sutton
Sutton & Murphy
contact info
Intervenor Pla
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as subrogee for Acco Engineered Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Anna Joy Monteleone
Michael Sullivan And Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Ozzie Lee
Represented By
John Charles Stein
The Boccardo Law Firm
contact info

GPO Nov 07 2023
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO DECEMBER 15, 2023; SETTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO REMAND AND SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO INTERVENE BY LIBERTY ASSURANCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
GPO Dec 04 2023
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO INTERVENE BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE FOR ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS INC. granting 31 Motion to Intervene. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
GPO Dec 08 2023
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND denying 20 Motion to Remand. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/8/2023)
GPO Dec 18 2023
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/18/2023. TRIAL ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
93 93 adr Certification of ADR Session Thu 05/01 4:24 PM
Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Hon. Ellen S. James Related [+]: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on April 16, 2025. The case did not settle. Further facilitated discussions are expected by May 15, 2025. Mediation process is ongoing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] t.
Friday, April 25, 2025
92 92 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 04/25 11:58 AM
Order AS AMENDED by Judge Susan Illston granting 91 Stipulation. Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2025. Dispositive Motion due by 6/27/2025. Replies due by 7/11/2025. Responses due by 7/18/2025. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
91 91 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/25 11:16 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Application and Stipulation to Amend Pre-Trial Order Extending Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motion Cut-Off filed by Terex USA, LLC (a dba of Terex Corporation).(Dubrawski, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Amending Pre-Trial Conference Dates