California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04617
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:25 AM PST
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
Represented By
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Samuel Quinn Schleier
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Paul Augusto Alarcon
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Colton Parks
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
H. D.
Represented By
Rachel Beth Abrams
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane Conway & Wise, LLP
contact info
Adam Brett Wolf
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane Conway & Wise, LLP
contact info
Angela J. Nehmens
Estey & Bomberger, LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 23 2023
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-md-3084-CRB. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 23, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/24 7:35 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by H. D.. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
28 28 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/09 11:31 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short-Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by H. D.. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
27 27 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/24 10:18 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
utility MDL Member Case Tue 10/24 8:27 AM
MEMBER CASE MDL 3084: 3:23-cv-04617-CRB D. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al pursuant to Order Relating Cases (Docket 26 in 3:23-md-03084-CRB) cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Tue 10/24 9:52 AM
MEMBER CASE MDL 3084: 3:23-cv-04617-VC D. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al pursuant to Order Relating Cases (Docket 26 in 3:23-md-03084-CRB) cc: JPMDL (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Mon 10/23 7:47 PM
ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/23/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Mon 10/23 2:07 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-md-3084-CRB. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 23, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
24 24 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/03 3:33 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND RASIER, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colton Parks (Parks, Colton)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Quinn Schleier (Schleier, Samuel)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/28 10:47 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Augusto Alarcon (Alarcon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Mon 09/25 2:40 PM
Notice of Related Actions Filed in MDL 3084 In re: Uber Technologies, Inc. Passenger Sexual Assault Litigation. (Rule 6.2(d) of the Rules of Procedure for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation). (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 09/25 9:30 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H. D. re16 Summons Issued (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
17 17 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/22 9:44 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
16 16 service Summons Issued Wed 09/13 11:18 AM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
15 15 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 09/12 2:02 PM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 1 Motion for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously. (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 09/11 12:33 PM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2023 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, November 24, 2023, by no later than 12:00PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 09/11 12:25 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by H. D. Corrected . (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/11 12:19 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 09/11 12:04 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/11/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/11 10:33 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 09/11 10:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/11 7:26 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by H. D... (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/11 7:25 AM
Proposed Summons. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 09/08 2:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/15/2023 . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/08 1:56 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 09/08 1:16 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by H. D. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/08 1:11 PM
Proposed Summons. (Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (ACANDC-18626597 $402.00)Filed byH. D..(Abrams, Rachel) Modified on 9/8/2023 (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Protective Order Fri 09/08 1:07 PM
MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously; Memorandum of Law in Support filed by H. D.. Responses due by 9/22/2023.(Abrams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
DISREGARD PAID[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re:2 Complaint filed by H. D. (ark, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/8/2023 (as, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 09/08 1:39 PM
DISREGARD PAID[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re:2 Complaint filed by H. D. (ark, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/8/2023 (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 09/08 3:10 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Submit one summons for all defendants. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:3 Proposed Summons filed by H. D. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]