California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-04613
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Terminated:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:25 AM PST
Defendant
Tesla Motors, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph C Alm
Tesla, Inc.
contact info
Krista Marie Carter
Tesla, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Safety Direct LLC
Represented By
Karthik Krishna Murthy
Murthy Patent Law Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 10/10 4:06 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/10 12:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tesla Motors, Inc... (Alm, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 09/27 8:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Safety Direct LLC (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 8:26 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Safety Direct LLC.. (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 09/26 10:02 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/10/2023 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 09/25 12:25 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint filed by Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Alm, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/20 9:51 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET #1 against Tesla Motors, Inc.. Filed bySafety Direct LLC.(Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 09/13 10:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safety Direct LLC. served on DIANA RUIZ for Tesla Motors, Inc., served on 9/12/2023, answer due 10/3/2023. filed by Safety Direct LLC. (Murthy, Karthik) Modified on 9/13/2023. Incorrect event selected when posting document (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
7 7 misc Patent/Trademark Report Fri 09/08 1:40 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 09/08 1:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Tesla Motors, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/08 1:03 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/08 11:39 AM
Proposed Summons. (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report Fri 09/08 11:35 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/08 9:47 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2023. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/08 9:41 AM
COMPLAINT against tesla motors, inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18624705.). Filed bysafety direct llc.(Murthy, Karthik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit