Washington Western District Court
Judge:John C Coughenour
Case #: 2:23-cv-01395
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2023
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 23-00002-14637-9-SEA
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 06, 2024 12:56 AM PST
Defendant
5326 Roosevelt Way LLC
Represented By
Danial D Pharris
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Paul J Spadafora
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe Heck
Represented By
Justin E Bolster
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Seth Heck
Represented By
Danial D Pharris
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Paul J Spadafora
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Justin E Bolster
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Beijing Men
Represented By
Karleen Joy Scharer
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt (sea)
contact info
David Ryan Ebel
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt (sea)
contact info
Defendant
James Thorpe
Represented By
Danial D Pharris
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Paul J Spadafora
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Thorpe
Represented By
Danial D Pharris
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Paul J Spadafora
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Defendant
Shu-Mei Wang
Represented By
Karleen Joy Scharer
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt (sea)
contact info
David Ryan Ebel
Schwabe Williamson & Wyatt (sea)
contact info
Defendant
183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC
Represented By
Danial D Pharris
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Paul J Spadafora
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Defendant
4206 7th Ave LLC
Represented By
Danial D Pharris
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Paul J Spadafora
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Defendant
Northlake Capital and Development LLC
Represented By
Danial D Pharris
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Paul J Spadafora
Lasher Holzapfel Sperry & Ebberson
contact info
Plaintiff
Zhijie Zhu
Represented By
Daniel J Frohlich
Dickson Frohlich Phillips Burgess Pllc (tac)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
48 48 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/08 10:44 AM
Mail addressed to 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC returned as Undeliverable re44 Clerk's Entry of Default. (KRA)
Related: [-]
47 47 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/08 10:39 AM
Mail addressed to 4206 7th Ave LLC returned as Undeliverable re44 Clerk's Entry of Default. (KRA)
Related: [-]
46 46 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/08 10:36 AM
Mail addressed to Northlake Capital and Development LLC returned as Undeliverable re44 Clerk's Entry of Default. (KRA)
Related: [-]
45 45 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/08 10:34 AM
Mail addressed to 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC returned as Undeliverable re44 Clerk's Entry of Default. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
44 44 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 03/27 1:18 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Northlake Capital and Development LLC, 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC. (cc: Default Defendants via USPS) (KMP) Modified on 3/27/2025 to add cc. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
43 43 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/12 8:34 AM
Mail addressed to 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC returned as Undeliverable re41 Minute Order. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/27 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Catherine Cecily Clark on behalf of Defendant Shu-Mei Wang. (Clark, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
41 41 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/26 9:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In order to accommodate the Courts calendar, trial in this matter is CONTINUED to 9 a.m. on 11/17/2025 , and several pre-trial deadlines are RESET as follows: Motions in Limine due by 11/7/2025, Pretrial Order due by 11/7/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/13/2025. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA) (cc: Defendants via USPS) Modified re cc information on 2/26/2025 (KRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 02/25 1:48 PM
Attorney Catherine Cecily Clark added for Defendant Beijing Men, per40 Notice of Appearance. (KRA)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re Lack of Proper Signature Tue 02/25 1:50 PM
NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The40 Notice of Appearance was not signed by Kyle Berti . As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with[LINK:ECF Filing Procedures] . Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (KRA) (cc: Kyle Berti via ad hoc NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Catherine Cecily Clark on behalf of Defendant Shu-Mei Wang. (Clark, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
39 39 misc Notice to Withdraw Pending Motion Wed 02/19 2:27 PM
NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re32 MOTION for Default against Heck and Thorpe, ; by Plaintiff Zhijie Zhu. (Frohlich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/19 2:25 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Zhijie Zhu, TO RESPONSE to33 MOTION for Default against NORTHLAKE CAPITAL and DEVELOPMENT, LLC, a Washington limited liability company; 183RD SHORELINE APARTMENTS, LLC, a Washington limited liability company; 5326 ROOSEVELT WAY, LLC, a Washington limited liability company; and 42 (Frohlich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 02, 2025
37 37 respm Response to Motion Sun 02/02 9:42 AM
RESPONSE, by Defendant James Thorpe, to32 MOTION for Default against Heck and Thorpe,. (Thorpe, James)
Related: [-]
36 36 answer Answer to Complaint Sun 02/02 9:38 AM
ANSWER to Complaint; Notice of removal by James Thorpe.(Thorpe, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
35 35 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/31 8:30 AM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Seth Heck, to32 MOTION for Default against Heck and Thorpe,. (Bolster, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
34 34 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 01/30 5:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, by Seth Heck.(Bolster, Justin)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Default Thu 01/30 4:24 PM
MOTION for Default against NORTHLAKE CAPITAL and DEVELOPMENT, LLC, a Washington limited liability company; 183RD SHORELINE APARTMENTS, LLC, a Washington limited liability company; 5326 ROOSEVELT WAY, LLC, a Washington limited liability company; and 4206 7TH AVE, LLC,, filed by Plaintiff Zhijie Zhu. Noting Date 2/26/2025, (Frohlich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Default Thu 01/30 4:21 PM
MOTION for Default against Heck and Thorpe,, filed by Plaintiff Zhijie Zhu. Noting Date 2/26/2025, (Frohlich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Unavailability Wed 01/15 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Daniel J Frohlich for Plaintiff Zhijie Zhu from January 30, 2025 February 17, 2025 March 3, 20205 March 10, 2025 March 17, 2025 March 24, 2025 April 10, 2025 April 22, 2025 April 28, 2025 May 9, 2025 May 19, 2025 May 27, 2025 June 12, 2025 June 24, 2025 July 21, 2025 August 11, 2025. (Frohlich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 11/18 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Compliance of ADR Requirement by Plaintiff Zhijie Zhu. (Frohlich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 07/10 2:07 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court GRANTS Mr. Ebel and Ms. Scharer's motion to withdraw (Dkt. No.24 ). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to Defendants Shu-Mei Wang and Beijing Men, at 1633 185th Avenue NE, Bellevue, WA, 98008. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA) (cc: Defendants via USPS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
28 28 respm Declaration Mon 07/08 3:26 PM
Amended DECLARATION of David Ebel filed by Defendants Beijing Men, Shu-Mei Wang re24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Ebel, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
27 27 order 2 - Minute Order Fri 07/05 1:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER re Defendants'24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel is INSTRUCTED to submit an amended declaration that includes their clients' phone numbers within seven (7) days of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Mon 06/03 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Daniel W Rankin. Filed by Defendants Jane Doe Heck, Seth Heck. (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
25 25 respm Declaration Wed 05/22 1:39 PM
DECLARATION of David Ebel filed by Defendants Beijing Men, Shu-Mei Wang re24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Ebel, David)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/22 1:38 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Defendants Beijing Men, Shu-Mei Wang. Noting Date 6/7/2024, (Ebel, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
23 23 notice Notice re Pro Se Registration Wed 04/17 5:03 PM
NOTICE: Defendant James Thorpe has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (LH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 04/09 9:56 AM
ORDER granting Defendants'12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court FINDS that good cause exists for the withdrawal of counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that Attorneys Danial D. Pharris and Paul J. Spadafora are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for the Defendants in this matter. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
21 21 misc Declaration (non motion) Thu 04/04 5:17 PM
DECLARATION of James Thorpe Regarding LCR 83.2(b)(4) Disclosures re19 Minute Order,,, by Defendants 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, Jane Doe Heck, Seth Heck, Northlake Capital and Development LLC, James Thorpe, Kimberly Thorpe (Pharris, Danial)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Declaration (non motion) Thu 04/04 4:35 PM
DECLARATION of DANIAL D. PHARRIS PURSUANT TO LCR 83.2(b)(4) re19 Minute Order,,, by Defendants 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, Jane Doe Heck, Seth Heck, Northlake Capital and Development LLC, James Thorpe, Kimberly Thorpe (Pharris, Danial)
Related: [-]
19 19 order 2 - Minute Order Thu 04/04 1:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Counsel Danial D Pharris and Paul J Spadafora's12 Motion to Withdraw as attorneys to multiple Defendants. Pursuant to LCR 83.2(b)(6), Counsel seeking to withdraw representation from business entities, excepts sole proprietorships, must certify to the Court that they have advised all such business entities that they are required by law to be represented by an attorney admitted to practice before this Court and that failure to obtain replacement counsel by the date that the withdrawal is effective may result in dismissal of any of the business entities' claims and/or entry of default against them. The Court has not received any such certification. Counsel are thus INSTRUCTED to file the required certification under LCR 83.2(b)(6) within seven days of this minute order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/29 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justin E Bolster on behalf of Defendants Jane Doe Heck, Seth Heck. (Bolster, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
17 17 respm Declaration Fri 02/23 12:25 PM
DECLARATION of Seth Heck filed by Defendants 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, Jane Doe Heck, Seth Heck, Northlake Capital and Development LLC, James Thorpe, Kimberly Thorpe re12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Pharris, Danial)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Declaration Fri 02/23 12:24 PM
DECLARATION of James Thorpe filed by Defendants 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, Jane Doe Heck, Seth Heck, Northlake Capital and Development LLC, James Thorpe, Kimberly Thorpe re12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Pharris, Danial)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Declaration Fri 02/23 12:22 PM
DECLARATION of Danial D. Pharris filed by Defendants 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, Jane Doe Heck, Seth Heck, Northlake Capital and Development LLC, James Thorpe, Kimberly Thorpe re12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Pharris, Danial)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/23 12:20 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, Jane Doe Heck, Seth Heck, Northlake Capital and Development LLC, James Thorpe, Kimberly Thorpe, TO RESPONSE to12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Pharris, Danial)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
13 13 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/15 9:47 AM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Zhijie Zhu, to12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney .(Frohlich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel in Support
Thursday, February 08, 2024
12 12 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/08 4:37 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Defendants 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, Jane Doe Heck, Seth Heck, Northlake Capital and Development LLC, James Thorpe, Kimberly Thorpe. Noting Date 2/23/2024, (Pharris, Danial)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Unavailability Wed 01/31 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Daniel J Frohlich for Plaintiff Zhijie Zhu from 3/1/2024 - 3/15/2024. (Frohlich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
10 10 order JCC-Civil Trial Scheduling Order (FORM) Thu 12/28 4:33 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' joint status report, the Court hereby sets this case for trial and orders the following case management schedule: 7 Day Bench Trial is set for 3/3/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. Pleading amendment/3rd pty action due by 3/4/2024, Discovery completed by 11/4/2024, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 11/18/2024, Dispositive motions due by 12/3/2024, Motions in Limine due by 2/21/2025, Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/27/2025. All discovery, including expert disclosures and all fact and expert depositions, must be completed by the discovery cutoff date. The parties must review and abide by the Court's Chambers Procedures, located at[LINK:https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/coughenour-procedures] which contain additional requirements and pretrial deadlines. Counsel are advised that this case is one of several cases set for the week described above. Counsel must be prepared to commence trial as scheduled but also be aware that the trial may have to be continued. Counsel are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov two to four weeks in advance of the trial date to inquire about the Court's calendar. Counsel must attend Courtroom Technology Training at least one month in advance of the trial to become familiar with the new A/V equipment now available in the courtroom. Contact the Courtroom Deputy to schedule an in-person training and technology check session. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
9 9 misc Joint Status Report Mon 12/18 4:33 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7. (Pharris, Danial)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
8 8 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 10/05 4:36 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Northlake Capital and Development, LLC for 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, Northlake Capital and Development LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC, 4206 7th Ave LLC, 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC, Northlake Capital and Development LLC. (Pharris, Danial)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
7 7 service Waiver of Service Wed 09/20 3:34 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant 183rd Shoreline Apartments LLC mailed on 9/15/2023; 4206 7th Ave LLC mailed on 9/15/2023; 5326 Roosevelt Way LLC mailed on 9/15/2023; Jane Doe Heck mailed on 9/15/2023; Seth Heck mailed on 9/15/2023; Northlake Capital and Development LLC mailed on 9/15/2023; James Thorpe mailed on 9/15/2023; Kimberly Thorpe mailed on 9/15/2023 (Frohlich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 order JCC-Interim JSR Minute Order Wed 09/20 10:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation. The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/1/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/8/2023, Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2023. (KMP)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM) Wed 09/20 10:36 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 09/15 11:09 AM
DEFENDANTS WANG AND MEN'S ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, by Beijing Men, Shu-Mei Wang.(Ebel, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Verification of State Court Records Fri 09/15 9:50 AM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Beijing Men, Shu-Mei Wang (Ebel, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Thu 09/14 4:25 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MG)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/14 4:19 PM
U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (MG)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Thu 09/14 4:58 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendants Northlake, 183rd Shoreline, 5325 Roosevelt and 4206 7th, must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/21/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(CDA)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 09/08 12:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23 2-14637 9-SEA; Related [+] filed by Beijing Men, Shu-Mei Wang.(Ebel, David)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8156263
Att: 1 Complaint Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Appearance,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet